EP3594192 - MELT MAGNESIA, BATCH COMPRISING THE MELT MAGNESIA, REFRACTORY CERAMIC PRODUCT COMPRISING THE MELT MAGNESIA AND A METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF MELT MAGNESIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Refractory Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG Wienerbergstraße 11 1100 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/03] | For all designated states Refractory Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG Wienerbergstrasse 11 1100 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GELBMANN, Gerald Kasernenstraße 11A 8700 Leoben / AT | 02 /
MAJCENOVIC, Christian Birkenweg 1 8111 Gratwein-Straßengel / AT | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | Berkenbrink, Kai-Oliver Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [2020/03] | Application number, filing date | 18182494.7 | 09.07.2018 | [2020/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3594192 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/05 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
C04B35/05 (EP);
C04B2235/3208 (EP);
C04B2235/3232 (EP);
C04B2235/3272 (EP);
C04B2235/3409 (EP);
C04B2235/3418 (EP);
C04B2235/65 (EP);
C04B2235/70 (EP);
C04B2235/72 (EP);
C04B2235/78 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHMELZMAGNESIA, EIN DIE SCHMELZMAGNESIA UMFASSENDER VERSATZ, EIN DIE SCHMELZMAGNESIA UMFASSENDES FEUERFESTES KERAMISCHES ERZEUGNIS SOWIE EIN VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SCHMELZMAGNESIA | [2020/03] | English: | MELT MAGNESIA, BATCH COMPRISING THE MELT MAGNESIA, REFRACTORY CERAMIC PRODUCT COMPRISING THE MELT MAGNESIA AND A METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF MELT MAGNESIA | [2020/03] | French: | MAGNÉSIE FONDUE, MELANGE COMPRENANT DE LA MAGNÉSIE FONDUE, PRODUIT CÉRAMIQUE REFRACTAIRE COMPRENANT DE LA MAGNÉSIE FONDUE AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE MAGNÉSIE FONDUE | [2020/03] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2019 | Examination requested [2020/03] | 09.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/51] | 30.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN108191439 (PANGANG METALLURGICAL MAT CO LTD) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [Y] - Gerald Buchebner und Hans-Jürgen Klischat, "4.2.1 Magnesiasteine; Tabelle 4.29", Gerald Buchebner und Hans-Jürgen Klischat, Gerald Routschka, Hartmut Wuthnow, Praxisbuch Feuerfeste Werkstoffe, 5. Auflage, Essen, DE, VULKAN VERLAG, (20111014), pages Deckblatt, IV, 102 - 105, ISBN 978-3-8027-3161-7, XP002785678 [Y] 1-11 * table 4.29 * | [Y] - O'DRISCOLL ET AL, "Fused magnesia, the blender's choice", INDUSTRIAL MINERALS, WORCESTER PARK, SURREY : METAL BULLETIN BOOKS LTD [1986-], GB, (19960101), no. 340, ISSN 0269-1701, pages 19 - 27, XP009508574 [Y] 1-11 * Seite 23, erster Teil; Tabelle 2; Seite 27, Abschnitt--> "Refractories -demand on the rise" * | by applicant | - Refractories for the Steel Industry, Elsevier Applied Sciences, (19900000), pages 167 - 169 | - R. SARKAR, Refractory Technology: Fundamentals and Applications, CRC Press, (20170000), page 48 |