EP3594611 - PYROTECHNIC IGNITION DEVICE FOR PYROTECHNIC ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fireworkssafety of Sweden HB Högstorpsvägen 102 352 42 Växjö / SE | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYLANDER, Magnus Högstorpsvägen 102 352 42 Växjö / SE | 02 /
JÖNSSON, Håkan Blåmesvägen 3 352 42 Växjö / SE | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/03] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 18183175.1 | 12.07.2018 | [2020/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3594611 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F42C15/184, F42C15/188, F42C15/24, F42C15/34, F42B4/06, F42B4/22, F42B4/26 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
F42C15/184 (EP);
F42B4/06 (EP);
F42B4/22 (EP);
F42B4/26 (EP);
F42C15/188 (EP);
F42C15/24 (EP);
F42C15/34 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PYROTECHNISCHE ZÜNDVORRICHTUNG FÜR PYROTECHNISCHE ARTIKEL | [2020/03] | English: | PYROTECHNIC IGNITION DEVICE FOR PYROTECHNIC ARTICLES | [2020/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALLUMAGE PYROTECHNIQUE POUR ARTICLES PYROTECHNIQUES | [2020/03] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/53] | 12.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/53] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US4058060 (DUKIC FERDINANDO V) [X] 1-5,7,9,15 * column 2, lines 10-68 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 11-14 [I] 6,8; | [X]US5044281 (RAMSAY PETER [AU], et al) [X] 1-4,10,15 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 32 * * column 7, line 44 - column 8, line 6 * * figures 1,5 *; | [A]US2010282109 (CALDWELL MARCUS L [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US3086468 (GARRARD MOUNTJOY, et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE443189 (VORMALS SKODAWERKE AG) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | CN203349704U |