EP3594665 - OPTICAL INSPECTION DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van der Zwan, Bertram Adriaan Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | 02 /
Oostrom, Sjoerd Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | 03 /
Speet, Bart Gerardus c/o TNO IP & Contracting Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [2020/10] |
Former [2020/03] | 01 /
van der Zwan, Bertram Adriaan Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | ||
02 /
Oostrom, Sjoerd Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | |||
03 /
Speet, Bert Gerardus c/o TNO IP & Contracting Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2020/03] | Application number, filing date | 18183504.2 | 13.07.2018 | [2020/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3594665 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/88 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
G01N21/8806 (EP,US);
G01N21/31 (US);
G01N21/95 (US);
G02B21/365 (US);
G01N2201/02 (US);
G01N2201/0633 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE INSPEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2020/03] | English: | OPTICAL INSPECTION DEVICE AND METHOD | [2020/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'INSPECTION OPTIQUE | [2020/03] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/52] | 05.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002088952 (RAO NAGARAJA P [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 5 - page 8 *; | [A]US2015285743 (TUNG DAVID M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraph [0050] *; | [X] - CHARALAMPOS BAKOLIAS ET AL, "Dark-field Scheimpflug imaging for surface inspection", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, 1000 20th St. Bellingham WA 98225-6705 USA, (19970415), vol. 3029, doi:10.1117/12.271248, ISSN 0277-786X, ISBN 978-1-5106-2099-5, pages 57 - 68, XP055535904 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 57 - page 60 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.271248 |