EP3424931 - TETRAHYDRONAPHTHALENE DERIVATIVES THAT INHIBIT MCL-1 PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, California 91320-1799 / US | [2019/44] |
Former [2019/02] | For all designated states Amgen, Inc One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brown, Sean P. 28909 Hollowbrook Avenue Agoura Hills, CA 91303 / US | 02 /
LI, Yunxiao 2462 Pleasant Way Unit P Thousand Oaks, CA 91362 / US | 03 /
Lizazaburu, Mike Elias 1159 Palou Drive Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | 04 /
Lucas, Brian S 4 Brantwood Road Arlington, MA 02476 / US | 05 /
Paras, Nick A. 1161 Sheila Lane Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | 06 /
Taygerly, Joshua 213 Acadia Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | 07 /
Vimolratana, Marc One Amgen Center Drive c/o M/S 28-5 Thousand Oaks, CA 91320 / US | 08 /
Wang, Xianghong 4915 Shelton Street Dublin, CA 94568 / US | 09 /
Yu, Ming 42 Williams Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 10 /
Zancanella, Manuel 1705 Marina Court Apt. A San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | 11 /
Zhu, Liusheng 752 Orion Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 12 /
Gonzalez Buenrostro, Ana One Amgen Center Drive c/o M/S 28-5 Thousand Oaks, CA 91320 / US | 13 /
LI, Zhihong 467 Anita Drive Millbrae, CA 94030 / US | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/02] | Application number, filing date | 18187957.8 | 28.08.2015 | [2019/02] | Priority number, date | US201462043929P | 29.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462043929 P | [2019/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3424931 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3424931 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3424931 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D513/08, A61K31/554, A61P35/00 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
C07D513/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07D513/08 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/395 (IL);
A61K31/554 (KR);
A61K39/39558 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
C07C311/11 (US);
C07C59/56 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] |
Former [2019/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 28.03.2019 | ME | 28.03.2019 | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN ZUR HEMMUNG DES MCL-1-PROTEINS | [2019/02] | English: | TETRAHYDRONAPHTHALENE DERIVATIVES THAT INHIBIT MCL-1 PROTEIN | [2019/02] | French: | COMPOSÉS QUI INHIBENT L'EXPRESSION DE LA PROTÉINE MCL-1 | [2019/02] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/19] | 28.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15772048.3 / EP3186259 | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2015 | AL | 12.02.2020 | AT | 12.02.2020 | CY | 12.02.2020 | CZ | 12.02.2020 | DK | 12.02.2020 | EE | 12.02.2020 | FI | 12.02.2020 | HR | 12.02.2020 | LT | 12.02.2020 | LV | 12.02.2020 | MC | 12.02.2020 | MK | 12.02.2020 | MT | 12.02.2020 | NL | 12.02.2020 | PL | 12.02.2020 | RO | 12.02.2020 | RS | 12.02.2020 | SE | 12.02.2020 | SI | 12.02.2020 | SK | 12.02.2020 | SM | 12.02.2020 | TR | 12.02.2020 | BG | 12.05.2020 | NO | 12.05.2020 | GR | 13.05.2020 | IS | 12.06.2020 | PT | 05.07.2020 | IE | 28.08.2020 | LU | 28.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 28.08.2015 | |
AL | 12.02.2020 | ||
AT | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
IE | 28.08.2020 | ||
LU | 28.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 28.08.2015 | |
AT | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
IE | 28.08.2020 | ||
LU | 28.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
IE | 28.08.2020 | ||
LU | 28.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
LU | 28.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
LU | 28.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
NO | 12.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008131000 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [A] 1-13,15 * page 1, line 5 - line 7; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2011022312 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [A] 1,14* 3-4 page 35 *; | [A]WO2013149124 (UNIV MICHIGAN [US], et al) [A] 1-13,15 * claims 1,20 *; | [XP] - MICHAEL G. JOHNSON ET AL, "Convenient Route to Secondary Sulfinates: Application to the Stereospecific Synthesis of [alpha]- C -Chiral Sulfonamides", ORGANIC LETTERS, US, (20141121), vol. 16, no. 23, doi:10.1021/ol503208z, ISSN 1523-7060, pages 6248 - 6251, XP055513901 [XP] 1,2 * Sheme 3, 4k * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol503208z | by applicant | US4522811 | US6468798 | US6472375 | US6471996 | - BEROUKHIM et al., Nature, (20100000), vol. 463, pages 899 - 90 | - G. LESSENE; P. CZABOTAR; P. COLMAN, Nat. Rev. Drug. Discov., (20080000), vol. 7, pages 989 - 1000 | - C. AKGUL, Cell. Mol. Life Sci., (20090000), vol. 66 | - ARTHUR M. MANDELIN II; RICHARD M. POPE, Expert Opin. Ther. Targets, (20070000), vol. 11, no. 3, pages 363 - 373 | - R.C. Rowe , P.J. Sheskey, and S.C. Owen, Handbook of Pharmaceutical Excipients, 5t ed., Pharmaceutical Press, (20050000), vol. 928 | - BERGE et al., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. Pharm. Sci., (19770000), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 | - HAMAJIMA et al., Clin. Immunol. Immunopathol., (19980000), vol. 88, no. 2, pages 205 - 10 | - S. M. BERGE et al., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J Pharm Sci, (19770000), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 | - T. HIGUCHI; W. STELLA, "Pro-drugs as Novel Delivery Systems", T. HIGUCHI; W. STELLA, Edward B. Roche, A.C.S. Symposium Series, and in Bioreversible Carriers in Drug Design, American Pharmaceutical Association and Pergamon Press, (19870000), vol. 14 | - BRUBAKER, J.D.; MYERS, A.G., Org. Lett., (20070000), vol. 9, pages 3523 - 3525 | - KRASOVSKIY, A.; KNOCHEL, P., Synthesis, (20060000), pages 890 - 891 | - SIGMAN, M. S. et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19990000), vol. 134, no. 28, pages 11408 - 11411 | - SIGMAN, M. S. et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20120000), vol. 134, no. 28, pages 11408 - 11411 |