blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3493329

EP3493329 - PHASE CONTROLLER AND PHASE CONTROLLING METHOD FOR ANTENNA ARRAY, AND COMMUNICATION APPARATUS USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.09.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.09.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.07.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.10.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
National Chung Shan Institute of Science and Technology
No.481, Chia An Sec.
Chung Cheng Road
Longtan District
Taoyuan City 325 / TW
[2019/23]
Inventor(s)01 / YAO, Chia-Yu
7F., No. 54, Ln. 39, Sec.6, Roosevelt Rd.
Wenshan Dist.
116 Taipei City / TW
02 / CHEN, Shao
No. 88, Ln. 326, Zhulin Rd.
Linkou Dist.
244 New Taipei City / TW
03 / YU, Chien-Te
8F., No. 22, Ln. 158, Cihui 3rd St.
Zhongli Dist.
320 Taoyuan City / TW
 [2019/23]
Representative(s)DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB
Brienner Straße 1
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/23]DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB
Marstallstrasse 8
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date18188400.810.08.2018
[2019/23]
Priority number, dateUS20171582533829.11.2017         Original published format: US201715825338
[2019/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3493329
Date:05.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3493329
Date:28.10.2020
Language:EN
[2020/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2019
ClassificationIPC:H01Q3/38, H01Q3/42, H04B7/00
[2019/23]
CPC:
H01Q3/38 (EP,US); H01Q3/30 (KR); G01S13/38 (US);
G01S7/352 (US); H01Q1/247 (KR); H01Q21/00 (KR);
H01Q21/29 (US); H01Q3/26 (US); H01Q3/42 (EP,US);
H04B7/00 (EP,US); H04B7/0617 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/48]
Former [2019/23]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:PHASENREGLER UND PHASENREGELUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR GRUPPENANTENNE UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT VERWENDUNG DAVON[2019/23]
English:PHASE CONTROLLER AND PHASE CONTROLLING METHOD FOR ANTENNA ARRAY, AND COMMUNICATION APPARATUS USING THE SAME[2019/23]
French:CONTRÔLEUR DE PHASE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE PHASE POUR RÉSEAU D'ANTENNES ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION L'UTILISANT[2019/23]
Examination procedure17.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/48]
17.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.07.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.2020Fee for grant paid
14.09.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.09.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)29.07.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.08.2018
AL28.10.2020
AT28.10.2020
CY28.10.2020
CZ28.10.2020
DK28.10.2020
EE28.10.2020
ES28.10.2020
FI28.10.2020
HR28.10.2020
IT28.10.2020
LT28.10.2020
LV28.10.2020
MC28.10.2020
MK28.10.2020
NL28.10.2020
PL28.10.2020
RO28.10.2020
RS28.10.2020
SE28.10.2020
SI28.10.2020
SK28.10.2020
SM28.10.2020
BG28.01.2021
NO28.01.2021
GR29.01.2021
IS28.02.2021
PT01.03.2021
[2024/23]
Former [2023/33]HU10.08.2018
AL28.10.2020
AT28.10.2020
CY28.10.2020
CZ28.10.2020
DK28.10.2020
EE28.10.2020
ES28.10.2020
FI28.10.2020
HR28.10.2020
IT28.10.2020
LT28.10.2020
LV28.10.2020
MC28.10.2020
NL28.10.2020
PL28.10.2020
RO28.10.2020
RS28.10.2020
SE28.10.2020
SI28.10.2020
SK28.10.2020
SM28.10.2020
BG28.01.2021
NO28.01.2021
GR29.01.2021
IS28.02.2021
PT01.03.2021
Former [2023/30]AL28.10.2020
AT28.10.2020
CY28.10.2020
CZ28.10.2020
DK28.10.2020
EE28.10.2020
ES28.10.2020
FI28.10.2020
HR28.10.2020
IT28.10.2020
LT28.10.2020
LV28.10.2020
MC28.10.2020
NL28.10.2020
PL28.10.2020
RO28.10.2020
RS28.10.2020
SE28.10.2020
SI28.10.2020
SK28.10.2020
SM28.10.2020
BG28.01.2021
NO28.01.2021
GR29.01.2021
IS28.02.2021
PT01.03.2021
Former [2022/23]AL28.10.2020
AT28.10.2020
CZ28.10.2020
DK28.10.2020
EE28.10.2020
ES28.10.2020
FI28.10.2020
HR28.10.2020
IT28.10.2020
LT28.10.2020
LV28.10.2020
MC28.10.2020
NL28.10.2020
PL28.10.2020
RO28.10.2020
RS28.10.2020
SE28.10.2020
SI28.10.2020
SK28.10.2020
SM28.10.2020
BG28.01.2021
NO28.01.2021
GR29.01.2021
IS28.02.2021
PT01.03.2021
Former [2022/18]AL28.10.2020
AT28.10.2020
CZ28.10.2020
DK28.10.2020
EE28.10.2020
ES28.10.2020
FI28.10.2020
HR28.10.2020
IT28.10.2020
LT28.10.2020
LV28.10.2020
MC28.10.2020
NL28.10.2020
PL28.10.2020
RO28.10.2020
RS28.10.2020
SE28.10.2020
SI28.10.2020
SK28.10.2020
SM28.10.2020
BG28.01.2021
NO28.01.2021
GR29.01.2021
PT01.03.2021
Former [2022/10]AL28.10.2020
AT28.10.2020
CZ28.10.2020
DK28.10.2020
EE28.10.2020
ES28.10.2020
FI28.10.2020
HR28.10.2020
IT28.10.2020
LT28.10.2020
LV28.10.2020
NL28.10.2020
PL28.10.2020
RO28.10.2020
RS28.10.2020
SE28.10.2020
SI28.10.2020
SK28.10.2020
SM28.10.2020
BG28.01.2021
NO28.01.2021
GR29.01.2021
PT01.03.2021
Former [2021/50]AL28.10.2020
AT28.10.2020
CZ28.10.2020
DK28.10.2020
EE28.10.2020
ES28.10.2020
FI28.10.2020
HR28.10.2020
IT28.10.2020
LT28.10.2020
LV28.10.2020
NL28.10.2020
PL28.10.2020
RO28.10.2020
RS28.10.2020
SE28.10.2020
SI28.10.2020
SK28.10.2020
SM28.10.2020
BG28.01.2021
NO28.01.2021
GR29.01.2021
IS28.02.2021
PT01.03.2021
Former [2021/48]AL28.10.2020
AT28.10.2020
CZ28.10.2020
DK28.10.2020
EE28.10.2020
ES28.10.2020
FI28.10.2020
HR28.10.2020
IT28.10.2020
LT28.10.2020
LV28.10.2020
NL28.10.2020
PL28.10.2020
RO28.10.2020
RS28.10.2020
SE28.10.2020
SK28.10.2020
SM28.10.2020
BG28.01.2021
NO28.01.2021
GR29.01.2021
IS28.02.2021
PT01.03.2021
Former [2021/45]AL28.10.2020
AT28.10.2020
CZ28.10.2020
DK28.10.2020
EE28.10.2020
ES28.10.2020
FI28.10.2020
HR28.10.2020
LT28.10.2020
LV28.10.2020
NL28.10.2020
PL28.10.2020
RO28.10.2020
RS28.10.2020
SE28.10.2020
SK28.10.2020
SM28.10.2020
BG28.01.2021
NO28.01.2021
GR29.01.2021
IS28.02.2021
PT01.03.2021
Former [2021/37]AT28.10.2020
CZ28.10.2020
DK28.10.2020
EE28.10.2020
ES28.10.2020
FI28.10.2020
HR28.10.2020
LT28.10.2020
LV28.10.2020
NL28.10.2020
PL28.10.2020
RO28.10.2020
RS28.10.2020
SE28.10.2020
SK28.10.2020
SM28.10.2020
BG28.01.2021
NO28.01.2021
GR29.01.2021
IS28.02.2021
PT01.03.2021
Former [2021/36]AT28.10.2020
CZ28.10.2020
EE28.10.2020
ES28.10.2020
FI28.10.2020
HR28.10.2020
LT28.10.2020
LV28.10.2020
NL28.10.2020
PL28.10.2020
RO28.10.2020
RS28.10.2020
SE28.10.2020
SK28.10.2020
SM28.10.2020
BG28.01.2021
NO28.01.2021
GR29.01.2021
IS28.02.2021
PT01.03.2021
Former [2021/35]AT28.10.2020
CZ28.10.2020
ES28.10.2020
FI28.10.2020
HR28.10.2020
LT28.10.2020
LV28.10.2020
NL28.10.2020
PL28.10.2020
RO28.10.2020
RS28.10.2020
SE28.10.2020
SK28.10.2020
SM28.10.2020
BG28.01.2021
NO28.01.2021
GR29.01.2021
IS28.02.2021
PT01.03.2021
Former [2021/33]AT28.10.2020
ES28.10.2020
FI28.10.2020
HR28.10.2020
LT28.10.2020
LV28.10.2020
NL28.10.2020
PL28.10.2020
RS28.10.2020
SE28.10.2020
SM28.10.2020
BG28.01.2021
NO28.01.2021
GR29.01.2021
IS28.02.2021
PT01.03.2021
Former [2021/32]AT28.10.2020
ES28.10.2020
FI28.10.2020
HR28.10.2020
LV28.10.2020
NL28.10.2020
PL28.10.2020
RS28.10.2020
SE28.10.2020
SM28.10.2020
BG28.01.2021
NO28.01.2021
GR29.01.2021
IS28.02.2021
PT01.03.2021
Former [2021/30]AT28.10.2020
ES28.10.2020
FI28.10.2020
HR28.10.2020
LV28.10.2020
NL28.10.2020
PL28.10.2020
RS28.10.2020
SE28.10.2020
BG28.01.2021
NO28.01.2021
GR29.01.2021
IS28.02.2021
PT01.03.2021
Former [2021/28]AT28.10.2020
ES28.10.2020
FI28.10.2020
HR28.10.2020
LV28.10.2020
PL28.10.2020
RS28.10.2020
SE28.10.2020
BG28.01.2021
NO28.01.2021
GR29.01.2021
IS28.02.2021
PT01.03.2021
Former [2021/25]AT28.10.2020
ES28.10.2020
FI28.10.2020
LV28.10.2020
PL28.10.2020
RS28.10.2020
SE28.10.2020
BG28.01.2021
NO28.01.2021
GR29.01.2021
IS28.02.2021
PT01.03.2021
Former [2021/23]AT28.10.2020
FI28.10.2020
LV28.10.2020
RS28.10.2020
SE28.10.2020
BG28.01.2021
NO28.01.2021
GR29.01.2021
PT01.03.2021
Former [2021/22]FI28.10.2020
RS28.10.2020
NO28.01.2021
PT01.03.2021
Former [2021/21]FI28.10.2020
PT01.03.2021
Former [2021/20]FI28.10.2020
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0231071  (MARCONI CO LTD [GB]) [A] 1-20 * column 1 - column 4; figures 1-2 *;
 [T]  - YAO CHIA-YU ET AL, "Controlling a switched beam array antenna using PLL frequency synthesizers based on the congruence modulo", 2018 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS (ISCAS), IEEE, (20180527), doi:10.1109/ISCAS.2018.8350999, pages 1 - 4, XP033434446 [T] 1-20

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.2018.8350999
 [A]  - BO SHI ET AL, "Electronic beam steering using PLL array for radar applications in W-band", 2015 IEEE 5TH ASIA-PACIFIC CONFERENCE ON SYNTHETIC APERTURE RADAR (APSAR), (20150901), doi:10.1109/APSAR.2015.7306206, ISBN 978-1-4673-7297-8, pages 274 - 276, XP055557949 [A] 1-20 * Section II. and III.;; figures 1-3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APSAR.2015.7306206
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.