EP3444376 - METHOD FOR FORMING METAL OXIDE LAYER, AND PLASMA-ENHANCED CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2019/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KO, Dong Kyun 635-2402, 16, Dongtanbanseok-ro, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 02 /
KIM, Woo Jin 204-1504, 334, Dongtanjiseong-ro, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 03 /
KIM, In Kyo 406-502, 70, Neuti-ro, Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 04 /
PARK, Keun Hee 282-7, Uicheon-ro, Dobong-gu Seoul / KR | 05 /
JUNG, Suk Won 310-2601, 201, Dalbit 1-ro Sejong-si / KR | [2019/08] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2019/08] | Application number, filing date | 18189051.8 | 14.08.2018 | [2019/08] | Priority number, date | KR20170103137 | 14.08.2017 Original published format: KR 20170103137 | [2019/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3444376 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3444376 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/40, C23C16/455, C23C16/517, H01J37/32 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
C23C16/405 (EP,US);
H01L21/02274 (KR,US);
C23C16/40 (CN);
C23C16/455 (EP,US);
C23C16/45536 (KR);
C23C16/45565 (EP,US);
C23C16/50 (CN);
C23C16/517 (EP,US);
C23C16/52 (CN);
H01J37/32137 (EP,US);
H01J37/32146 (EP,US);
H01J37/3244 (EP,US);
H01J37/32449 (EP,US);
H01L21/02172 (KR);
H01L21/0228 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/05] |
Former [2019/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FORMUNG EINER METALLOXIDSCHICHT UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PLASMAGESTÜTZTEN GASPHASENABSCHEIDUNG | [2019/08] | English: | METHOD FOR FORMING METAL OXIDE LAYER, AND PLASMA-ENHANCED CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION DEVICE | [2019/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE COUCHE D'OXYDE MÉTALLIQUE ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉPÔT CHIMIQUE EN PHASE VAPEUR ACTIVÉ PAR PLASMA | [2019/08] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/05] | 20.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008199632 (WOLDEN COLIN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8 * paragraphs [0053] , [0058] , [0069] * [I] 3-6; | [XI]US2010075510 (JAN DER-JUN [TW], et al) [X] 1,7-9 * paragraphs [0021] - [0025] * [I] 2-6; | [Y]US2011247559 (LIU JUN-CHIN [TW], et al) [Y] 12-15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0023]; figure 4 *; | [Y]US2014272185 (NA JEONG-SEOK [US], et al) [Y] 12* paragraph [0040]; figure 4 *; | [Y]US2015232992 (KIM TAEWAN [US], et al) [Y] 12-15 * paragraphs [0039] - [0046]; figure 3 *; | [Y]US2016336174 (UNDERWOOD BRIAN SAXTON [US], et al) [Y] 12-15 * paragraphs [0024] - [0025]; figure 1 *; | [XI] - SZYMANSKI SCOTT ET AL, "Effect of wall conditions on the self-limiting deposition of metal oxides by pulsed plasma-enhanced chemical vapor deposition", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART A, AVS /AIP, MELVILLE, NY., US, (20070910), vol. 25, no. 6, doi:10.1116/1.2779039, ISSN 0734-2101, pages 1493 - 1499, XP012102770 [X] 1,2,8 * Experimental methods;; figure 1 * [I] 3-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.2779039 | [X] - SEMAN MICHAEL ET AL, "Enhancement of metal oxide deposition rate and quality using pulsed plasma-enhanced chemical vapor deposition at low frequency", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART A, AVS /AIP, MELVILLE, NY., US, (20080806), vol. 26, no. 5, doi:10.1116/1.2966425, ISSN 0734-2101, pages 1213 - 1217, XP012114005 [X] 1,8 * Experimental methods * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.2966425 | [X] - SEMAN M T ET AL, "An anaylsis of the deposition mechanisms involved during self-limiting growth of aluminum oxide by pulsed PECVD", CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION, WILEY-VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, DE, (20080901), vol. 14, no. 9/10, doi:10.1002/CVDE.200806701, ISSN 0948-1907, pages 296 - 302, XP001516205 [X] 1,8 * Results and Discussion;; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cvde.200806701 | [XI] - JUNG HANEARL ET AL, "Comparative study on growth characteristics and electrical properties of ZrO2films grown using pulsed plasma-enhanced chemical vapor deposition and plasma-enhanced atomic layer deposition for oxide thin film transistors", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART A, AVS /AIP, MELVILLE, NY., US, vol. 35, no. 3, doi:10.1116/1.4982224, ISSN 0734-2101, (20170428), (20170428), XP012218984 [X] 1,2,8 * Experimental methods, Results;; figures 2a,2b * [I] 3-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.4982224 | [XY] - MATHUR S ET AL, "CVD of titanium oxide coatings: Comparative evaluation of thermal and plasma assisted processes", SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 201, no. 3-4, doi:10.1016/J.SURFCOAT.2005.12.039, ISSN 0257-8972, (20061005), pages 807 - 814, (20061005), XP024996053 [X] 10,11 * paragraph [02.2]; figure 1 * [Y] 12-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.surfcoat.2005.12.039 | [I] - SATOSHI TANIMOTO ET AL, "SYNCHRONOUSLY EXCITED DISCRETE CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION OF TA2O5", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, (19940501), vol. 141, no. 5, doi:10.1149/1.2054920, ISSN 0013-4651, pages 1339 - 1346, XP000470155 [I] 10,11 * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.2054920 | [XI] - OH IL-KWON ET AL, "Very high frequency plasma reactant for atomic layer deposition", APPLIED SURFACE SCIENCE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20160614), vol. 387, doi:10.1016/J.APSUSC.2016.06.048, ISSN 0169-4332, pages 109 - 117, XP029679557 [X] 12 * Materials and Methods * [I] 15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apsusc.2016.06.048 | [XI] - IL-KWON OH ET AL, "Supplementary data for Very High Frequency Plasma Reactant for Atomic Layer Deposition", APPLIED SURFACE SCIENCE, (20160614), vol. 387, doi:10.1016/j.apsusc.2016.06.048, XP055588634 [X] 12 * figure 1 * [I] 15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apsusc.2016.06.048 |