EP3616792 - NITROGEN OXIDE STORAGE CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Umicore AG & Co. KG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | [2024/17] |
Former [2020/10] | For all designated states UMICORE AG & CO. KG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOERZ, Anke Am Nonnenhof 70 60435 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
HOYER, Ruediger Auf der Rauhbeine 1a 63755 Alzenau-Hoerstein / DE | 03 /
BETZ, Benjamin Weiersgrund 35 63864 Gladbach / DE | [2020/10] | Application number, filing date | 18191226.2 | 28.08.2018 | [2020/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3616792 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/00, B01J23/63, B01D53/94, F01N3/08, F01N3/10 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
B01D53/9422 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/19 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/9418 (US);
B01D53/9472 (US);
B01D53/9477 (EP,KR,US);
B01J21/04 (US);
B01J21/066 (US);
B01J21/10 (US);
B01J23/002 (US);
B01J23/63 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/40 (US);
F01N3/0814 (EP,KR);
F01N3/108 (EP,KR);
F01N3/2066 (US);
F01N3/2803 (US);
B01D2255/1021 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/1023 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/204 (EP,KR);
B01D2255/2042 (US);
B01D2255/2047 (US);
B01D2255/2065 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/20715 (US);
B01D2255/407 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/50 (US);
B01D2255/9025 (EP,KR);
B01D2255/9035 (US);
B01D2255/904 (US);
B01D2255/91 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/9155 (US);
B01D2258/012 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] |
Former [2020/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STICKOXID-SPEICHERKATALYSATOR | [2020/10] | English: | NITROGEN OXIDE STORAGE CATALYST | [2020/10] | French: | CATALYSEUR DE STOCKAGE D'OXYDES D'AZOTE | [2020/10] | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/10] | 15.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 04.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 25.10.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 25.10.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.11.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 25.10.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 25.10.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.11.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005031501 (KAWAI MASAAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * example 8 *; | [A]US2005164879 (CHEN SHAU-LIN F [US]) [A] 1-16* example 3 *; | [I]US2011305612 (MUELLER-STACH TORSTEN [DE], et al) [I] 1-16 * paragraphs [0002] , [0012] , [0041] , [0044] , [0049] - [0054] - [0066] , [0067] , [0070] , [0073] , [0088] , [0101] - [0104] * * examples 1,2 *; | [ID]WO2012029050 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [ID] 1-16 * page 3, lines 4-20 * * page 7, lines 7-17 * * page 9, lines 5-16 * * page 14, line 25 - page 15, line 4 * * page 15, line 27 - page 16, line 21 * * examples 1-6 *; | [A]US2015190793 (SWALLOW DANIEL [GB], et al) [A] 1-16 * example 1 *; | [A]US2015336085 (HOYER RUEDIGER [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] - [0018] - [0030] - [0038] - [0049] * | by applicant | US5120695 | EP0559021 | EP0885650 | US6709644 | EP1399246 | EP1820561 | WO2008047170 | WO2008106519 | WO2008118434 | WO2008132452 | US2009320457 | WO2012029050 | WO2012071421 | WO2012156883 | US8617474 | WO2014184568 | WO2016020351 |