EP3453802 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CREATING A FINAL GRADED SOIL SURFACE HAVING A FINAL SOIL DEPTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2022 [2022/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNH Industrial Italia S.p.A. Via Plava 80 10135 Torino / IT | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELKINS, Scott A. 2207 Park Ridge Drive Plainfield, Illinois IL 60586 / US | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | CNH Industrial IP Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/11] | CNH Industrial IP Department Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 18192621.3 | 05.09.2018 | [2019/11] | Priority number, date | US201715696256 | 06.09.2017 Original published format: US201715696256 | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3453802 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/76, E02F3/84, E02F9/26 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
E02F3/844 (EP,US);
E02F3/7618 (EP,US);
E02F9/262 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] |
Former [2019/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM ERSTELLEN EINER ENDGÜLTIGEN ABGESTUFTEN BODENFLÄCHE MIT EINER ENDGÜLTIGEN BODENTIEFE | [2019/11] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CREATING A FINAL GRADED SOIL SURFACE HAVING A FINAL SOIL DEPTH | [2019/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE CRÉATION D'UNE SURFACE DE SOL GRADUÉE FINALE AYANT UNE PROFONDEUR DE SOL FINALE | [2019/11] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 13.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/03] | 15.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2899760 (ARMINGTON RAYMOND) [Y] 1-8,10-15 * column 2, line 72 - column 3, line 36; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]US2933838 (ROCKWELL HARVEY W) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5960569 (MOLSTAD DON [US]) [Y] 1,11* column 6, line 38 - line 49 *; | [Y]WO2012150867 (ACTUATE EQUIPMENT LTD [NZ], et al) [Y] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2016258129 (WEI MO [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * sentence 10, paragraph 23 - sentence 25; figure 1 * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0037] * |