EP3462079 - FILTER LENS, LED LAMP WITH FILTER LENS AND ILLUMINATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Self Electronics Co., Ltd. No. 1345 JuXian Road Hi-Tech Park Ningbo City, Zhejiang 315103 / CN | For all designated states SELF ELECTRONICS Germany GmbH August-Horch Str. 7 51149 Köln / DE | For all designated states Lin, Wanjiong No. 1345 JuXian Road Hi-Tech Park Ningbo City, Zhejiang 315103 / CN | [2019/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sheng, ZHANG No.1345,JuXian Road, Hi-tech Park Ningbo, 315103 / CN | [2019/14] | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2019/14] | Application number, filing date | 18192669.2 | 05.09.2018 | [2019/14] | Priority number, date | CN201710897347 | 28.09.2017 Original published format: CN201710897347 | [2019/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3462079 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F21V5/00, G02B3/00, G03B21/625, // F21Y115/10 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
F21V5/002 (EP,US);
F21V5/04 (CN);
F21K9/69 (US);
F21V23/004 (CN);
F21V9/00 (CN);
G02B27/30 (US);
G02B3/0037 (EP,US);
G02B5/20 (US);
G03B21/625 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/46] |
Former [2019/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILTERLINSE, LED-LAMPE MIT FILTERLINSE UND BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM | [2019/14] | English: | FILTER LENS, LED LAMP WITH FILTER LENS AND ILLUMINATION SYSTEM | [2019/14] | French: | VERRE FILTRANT, LAMPE À DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES AVEC LENTILLE DE FILTRE ET SYSTÈME D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2019/14] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/46] | 03.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.08.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008037947 (CHAO CHIH-CHIANG [TW], et al) [Y] 1,3,4* figure 14 *; | [Y]EP2110689 (TAIWAN NETWORK COMP & ELECTRON [TW]) [Y] 1,3,4 * figures 13, 30 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0 32] * |