EP3462053 - VIBRATION-DAMPING SUPPORT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhuzhou Times New Material Technology Co., Ltd No. 18 Haitian Road Tianyuan District Zhuzhou Hunan 412007 / CN | [2019/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUE, Tao No. 18 Haitian Road, Tianyuan District, Zhuzhou Hunan, 412007 / CN | 02 /
HU, Weihui No. 18 Haitian Road, Tianyuan District, Zhuzhou Hunan, 412007 / CN | 03 /
LIN, Sheng No. 18 Haitian Road, Tianyuan District, Zhuzhou Hunan, 412007 / CN | 04 /
SU, Zetao No. 18 Haitian Road, Tianyuan District, Zhuzhou Hunan, 412007 / CN | 05 /
YUAN, Pengfei No. 18 Haitian Road, Tianyuan District, Zhuzhou Hunan, 412007 / CN | 06 /
YANG, Chao No. 18 Haitian Road, Tianyuan District, Zhuzhou Hunan, 412007 / CN | 07 /
CHEN, Congeong No. 18 Haitian Road, Tianyuan District, Zhuzhou Hunan, 412007 / CN | 08 /
HOU, Ming No. 18 Haitian Road, Tianyuan District, Zhuzhou Hunan, 412007 / CN | 09 /
ZENG, Hui No. 18 Haitian Road, Tianyuan District, Zhuzhou Hunan, 412007 / CN | [2019/14] | Representative(s) | Marchitelli, Mauro Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [2020/48] |
Former [2019/14] | Marchitelli, Mauro Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 18193169.2 | 07.09.2018 | [2019/14] | Priority number, date | CN201710855034 | 20.09.2017 Original published format: CN201710855034 | CN201710853726 | 20.09.2017 Original published format: CN201710853726 | [2019/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3462053 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3462053 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16F1/40 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
F03D15/00 (EP,US);
F16F15/08 (US);
F03D7/0296 (US);
F16F1/406 (EP,US);
F03D80/88 (US);
F05B2260/964 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] |
Former [2019/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFENDE STÜTZVORRICHTUNG | [2019/14] | English: | VIBRATION-DAMPING SUPPORT DEVICE | [2019/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SUPPORT AMORTISSANT LES VIBRATIONS | [2019/14] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 04.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20194887.4 / EP3770460 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2018 | AL | 25.11.2020 | AT | 25.11.2020 | CY | 25.11.2020 | CZ | 25.11.2020 | EE | 25.11.2020 | FI | 25.11.2020 | HR | 25.11.2020 | IT | 25.11.2020 | LT | 25.11.2020 | LV | 25.11.2020 | MC | 25.11.2020 | MK | 25.11.2020 | MT | 25.11.2020 | NL | 25.11.2020 | PL | 25.11.2020 | RO | 25.11.2020 | RS | 25.11.2020 | SE | 25.11.2020 | SI | 25.11.2020 | SK | 25.11.2020 | SM | 25.11.2020 | BG | 25.02.2021 | NO | 25.02.2021 | GR | 26.02.2021 | IS | 25.03.2021 | PT | 25.03.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 07.09.2018 | |
AL | 25.11.2020 | ||
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
MK | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 07.09.2018 | |
AL | 25.11.2020 | ||
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 25.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2722391 (KRIEGHOFF ROBERT T) [X] 1-4,8,9,13 * figure 2 * [A] 5-7,11,12 [Y] 14 [I] 15; | [XAYI]WO9401695 (TRELLEBORG IND AKTIEBOLAG [SE], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3-12 [Y] 14 [I] 13,15; | [XAI]EP1136719 (HUTCHINSON [FR]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 4-12,14 [I] 13,15; | [AD]CN103075461B (ZHUZHOU TIMES NEW MAT TECH CO) [AD] 1-15* abstract * | Examination | US2004113338 | by applicant | CN103363005 | CN103075461B |