EP3506301 - SURGICAL SYSTEM DISTRIBUTED PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon LLC 475 Street C, Suite 401 Los Frailes Industrial Park Guaynabo 00969 / PR | [2019/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YATES, David C. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US | 02 /
SHELTON, IV, Frederick E. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/27] | Bettridge, Paul Sebastian Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18193671.7 | 11.09.2018 | [2019/27] | Priority number, date | US201762611339P | 28.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762611339 P | US201762611340P | 28.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762611340 P | US201762611341P | 28.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762611341 P | US201862649300P | 28.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862649300 P | US201815940663 | 29.03.2018 Original published format: US201815940663 | [2019/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3506301 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G16H40/63, G16H20/40 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
A61B17/3211 (US);
A61B17/068 (US);
G16H20/40 (EP,US);
G16H40/60 (US);
G16H40/67 (US);
A61B2017/00137 (US);
A61B2017/00225 (US);
A61B2018/00702 (US);
H04L2209/42 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] |
Former [2019/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHES SYSTEM MIT VERTEILTER VERARBEITUNG | [2019/27] | English: | SURGICAL SYSTEM DISTRIBUTED PROCESSING | [2019/27] | French: | TRAITEMENT DISTRIBUÉ D'UN SYSTÈME CHIRURGICAL | [2019/27] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 17.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 22.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 22.04.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 22.04.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.05.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004124964 (WANG YULUN [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document, in particular paragraphs [0018] to [0026], Fig. 1 *; | [X]US2010274087 (DIOLAITI NICOLA [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0162] - [0166] - [0171] , [0172] , [0188]; figures 30,31 *; | [XA]EP2772211 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5-11 * paragraphs [0089] , [0105] , [0176] , [0196] - [0213]; figures 114,115,116 * [A] 3,4; | [A] - FLORES HUBER ET AL, "Large-scale offloading in the Internet of Things", 2017 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PERVASIVE COMPUTING AND COMMUNICATIONS WORKSHOPS (PERCOM WORKSHOPS), IEEE, (20170313), doi:10.1109/PERCOMW.2017.7917610, pages 479 - 484, XP033092334 [A] 3,4 * the whole document, in particular sections I and II. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PERCOMW.2017.7917610 | [A] - KALANTARIAN HAIK ET AL, "Computation offloading for real-time health-monitoring devices", 2016 38TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY (EMBC), IEEE, (20160816), doi:10.1109/EMBC.2016.7591843, pages 4971 - 4974, XP032980281 [A] 3,4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/EMBC.2016.7591843 | [A] - Yuyi Mao ET AL, "A Survey on Mobile Edge Computing: The Communication Perspective", IEEE Communications Surveys & Tutorials, doi:10.1109/COMST.2017.2745201, (20170613), pages 2322 - 2358, URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1701.01090.pdf, (20181022), XP055517746 [A] 3,4 * the whole document, in particular section II. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/COMST.2017.2745201 | by applicant | US7982776 | US7995045 | US2011306840 | US2014243597 | US2014263552 | US9060775 | US9345481 | US2017086914 | US2017296213 |