EP3503503 - HEALTH STATUS MONITORING FOR SERVICES PROVIDED BY COMPUTING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): EE, PL, PT, RO | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOTADIA, Hiren R. c/o Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
KHUMRI, Mufaddal Y. c/o Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 03 /
REDNER, Jordan L. c/o Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 04 /
CHANG, Lawrence W. c/o Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 05 /
KIM, Tom M. c/o Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Black, Diego Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2023/25] |
Former [2019/26] | Black, Diego Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18194517.1 | 14.09.2018 | [2019/26] | Priority number, date | US201762609245P | 21.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762609245 P | US201815962885 | 25.04.2018 Original published format: US201815962885 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3503503 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3503503 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L67/1008, H04L67/1001 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
H04L67/1008 (EP,US);
H04L43/0817 (US);
G06F9/541 (US);
G06F9/547 (US);
H04L41/5016 (EP,US);
H04L43/0805 (EP,US);
H04L43/091 (US);
H04L43/12 (US);
H04L47/822 (US);
H04L61/4511 (US);
H04L67/1001 (EP,US);
H04L41/046 (US);
H04L41/0893 (US);
H04L41/12 (US);
H04L41/145 (US);
H04L41/5009 (US);
H04L43/02 (US);
H04L43/022 (US);
H04L43/04 (US);
H04L43/08 (EP,US);
H04L43/0823 (US);
H04L43/16 (US);
H04L67/10 (US);
H04L67/133 (US);
H04L67/75 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/26] | H04L29/08, H04L12/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Title | German: | GESUNDHEITSSTATUSÜBERWACHUNG FÜR DIENSTE, DIE VON RECHNERVORRICHTUNGEN BEREITGESTELLT WERDEN | [2019/26] | English: | HEALTH STATUS MONITORING FOR SERVICES PROVIDED BY COMPUTING DEVICES | [2019/26] | French: | SURVEILLANCE DE L'ÉTAT DE SANTÉ POUR DES SERVICES FOURNIS PAR DES DISPOSITIFS DE CALCUL | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 02.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 08.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23173440.1 / EP4231603 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2023 | CZ | 21.06.2023 | EE | 21.06.2023 | ES | 21.06.2023 | FI | 21.06.2023 | HR | 21.06.2023 | LT | 21.06.2023 | LV | 21.06.2023 | NL | 21.06.2023 | PL | 21.06.2023 | RO | 21.06.2023 | RS | 21.06.2023 | SE | 21.06.2023 | SK | 21.06.2023 | SM | 21.06.2023 | NO | 21.09.2023 | GR | 22.09.2023 | IS | 21.10.2023 | PT | 23.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/09] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US8255528 (RAJA MURALI [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 20 * * column 50, line 15 - column 51, line 40 * * column 52, line 25 - column 53, line 21 * * column 54, line 5 - column 55, line 21 * * column 56, line 35 - line 65 * * column 59, line 45 - line 61 * [Y] 6,7 [I] 2-5,9-15; | [A]US8908521 (DYKE ERIC [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 35; figure 1 *; | [YA]US2017126516 (TIAGI ALOK [US], et al) [Y] 6,7 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0064]; figure 3 * [A] 1-5,8-15 |