EP3626585 - DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DISPLAYING TRAFFIC INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Visteon Global Technologies, Inc. One Village Center Drive Van Buren Township, MI 48111-5711 / US | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PFEIFLE, Martin Glashäuserstrasse 26 72297 Seewald / DE | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 18196064.2 | 21.09.2018 | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3626585 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B62D15/02, B60W30/08, G01C21/30, G06K9/00, G08G1/16 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
G01C21/30 (EP);
B60W50/14 (CN,US);
G06V20/584 (EP,US);
B60K35/00 (US);
B60W40/04 (US);
G06T17/05 (US);
G08G1/0175 (EP);
G08G1/09623 (EP);
G08G1/166 (EP);
B60K2360/176 (US);
B60K35/23 (US);
B60K35/28 (US);
B60R2300/307 (US);
B60W2050/0043 (CN);
B60W2050/146 (CN,US);
B60W40/02 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRERASSISTENZSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANZEIGE VON VERKEHRSINFORMATIONEN | [2020/13] | English: | DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DISPLAYING TRAFFIC INFORMATION | [2020/13] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ASSISTANCE AU CONDUCTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE D'INFORMATIONS SUR LA CIRCULATION | [2020/13] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 09.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/36] | 03.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011042876 (ATSMON ALON [IL], et al) [A] 3,7 * paragraphs [0042] , [0140] , [0201] ** claim 1 *; | [XI]US2017174261 (MICKS ASHLEY ELIZABETH [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,10-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] , [0022] , [0027] , [0029] , [0031] , [0036] , [0037] , [0042] , [0046] , [0050] - [0051] - [0062] * [I] 3,7-9; | [XI]US2018144202 (MOOSAEI MARYAM [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8-15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0014] - [0016] - [0018] , [0021] , [0022] , [0024] , [0042] * [I] 3,5,7 |