EP3503656 - UPLINK DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.10.2020 [2020/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Haiyan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
DENG, Tianle Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
YAN, Yuanyuan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 18198773.6 | 14.03.2014 | [2019/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3503656 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, // H04W84/12 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04W74/085 (US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] |
Former [2019/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUFWÄRTSDATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, EINRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT DAFÜR | [2019/26] | English: | UPLINK DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT THEREFOR | [2019/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES DE LIAISON MONTANTE, APPAREIL ET PRODUIT PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE CORRESPONDANT | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 27.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.09.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/41] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14885669.3 / EP3107333 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN103299569 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2014019214 (BROADCOM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0016] * * figure 3; claim 10 *; | EP2922336 [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * abstract * * paragraph [0061] ** claims 1-29 * |