EP3633527 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING IMPROPER CURRENT PATHS IN AN ELECTRICAL UNIT WITH THE AID OF MODELLED CHARGED PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Binde Ingenieure, Design & Engineering GmbH Tannenring 41-43 65207 Wiesbaden / DE | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kretzschmar, Fritz Kiesstraße 21 64283 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Korolonek, Christian Platter Straße 56 65193 Wiesbaden / DE | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2020/15] | Application number, filing date | 18198916.1 | 05.10.2018 | [2020/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3633527 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
G06F30/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESTIMMEN PHYSIKALISCHER BESTIMMUNGSFREMDER STROMPFADE IN EINER ELEKTRISCHEN BAUEINHEIT MIT HILFE MODELLIERTER GELADENER TEILCHEN | [2020/15] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING IMPROPER CURRENT PATHS IN AN ELECTRICAL UNIT WITH THE AID OF MODELLED CHARGED PARTICLES | [2020/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION DES TRAJETS DE COURANT NON CONFORMES DANS UNE UNITÉ STRUCTURALE ÉLECTRIQUE À L'AIDE DE PARTICULES CHARGÉES MODELÉES | [2020/15] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 29.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017286588 (SUKHAREV VALERIY [US], et al) [X] 1,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0 39] , [0 56] - [0069] - [0 76] - [0077] - [0 79]; figures 1-6, 11; claims 7, 10, 11; table 1 * * the whole document * [I] 2-12; | [A] - LI YANDONG ET AL, "Microscopic simulation and characteristics analysis of surface discharge based on PIC-MCC method", 2018 CONDITION MONITORING AND DIAGNOSIS (CMD), IEEE, (20180923), doi:10.1109/CMD.2018.8535676, pages 1 - 5, XP033444902 [A] 1-13 * the entire document, in particular: the abstract, section II (the PIC-MCC method), section III (simulation of partial discharge) and Figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CMD.2018.8535676 | [A] - Zoltán Donkó, "Particle in Cell simulations of capacitive RF discharges", 2nd Graduate Summer Institute Complex Plasmas, (201008), pages 1 - 52, URL: http://www.theo-physik.uni-kiel.de/~bonitz/si10/donko, (20190513), XP055587705 [A] 1-13 * the entire document, in particular p. 11 (Monte-Carlo particle transport), p. 17-29 (the PIC simulation method), p. 31-33 (PIC simulations of RF discharges) * | by applicant | EP2953042 |