EP3446866 - MACHINE FOR MANUFACTURING CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/09] | A METHOD AND A MACHINE FOR MANUFACTURING CONTAINERS | ||
[2019/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Societa' per Azioni Curti - Costruzioni Meccaniche Via Emilia Ponente, 750 48014 Castel Bolognese (RA) / IT | [2019/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENINI, Nabore 23, Via Leonilde Iotti 48025 RIOLO TERME (RA) / IT | [2019/09] | Representative(s) | Corradini, Corrado, et al Ing. C. Corradini & C. S.r.l. Via Dante Alighieri 4 42121 Reggio Emilia / IT | [2019/09] | Application number, filing date | 18200544.7 | 05.05.2015 | [2019/09] | Priority number, date | IT2014RE00045 | 06.05.2014 Original published format: IT RE20140045 | [2019/09] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3446866 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3446866 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B31B50/28, B65D47/08 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
B29C66/49 (EP,US);
B31B50/592 (EP,US);
B29C65/08 (EP,US);
B29C65/088 (EP,US);
B29C65/7882 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/3452 (EP,US);
B29C66/43123 (EP,US);
B29C66/4322 (EP,US);
B29C66/5344 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C66/81415 (EP,US);
B29C66/81423 (EP,US);
B29C66/81463 (EP,US);
B29C66/8242 (EP,US);
B29C66/8322 (EP,US);
B29C66/83221 (EP,US);
B29C66/849 (EP,US);
B29C66/851 (EP,US);
B31B50/25 (EP,US);
B31B50/26 (EP,US);
B31B50/28 (EP,US);
B31B50/322 (EP,US);
B65B3/025 (EP,US);
B65B47/08 (EP,US);
B65B7/18 (EP,US);
B29C66/72328 (EP,US);
B29L2023/20 (EP,US);
B31B2110/20 (EP,US);
B31B50/042 (EP,US);
B31B50/06 (EP,US);
B31B50/07 (EP,US);
B31B50/252 (EP,US);
B31B50/324 (US);
B31B50/36 (US);
B31B50/594 (EP,US);
B31B50/66 (EP,US);
B31B50/81 (EP,US);
B31B50/88 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/38] |
Former [2019/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MASCHINE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BEHÄLTERN | [2019/41] | English: | MACHINE FOR MANUFACTURING CONTAINERS | [2019/41] | French: | MACHINE DE FABRICATION DE RÉCIPIENTS | [2019/41] |
Former [2019/09] | VERFAHREN UND MASCHINE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BEHÄLTERN | ||
Former [2019/09] | A METHOD AND A MACHINE FOR MANUFACTURING CONTAINERS | ||
Former [2019/09] | PROCÉDÉ ET MACHINE DE FABRICATION DE RÉCIPIENTS | Examination procedure | 09.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/38] | 09.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15166321.8 / EP2942188 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.05.2015 | AL | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | CZ | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | HR | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MC | 26.02.2020 | MK | 26.02.2020 | MT | 26.02.2020 | RO | 26.02.2020 | RS | 26.02.2020 | SI | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | SM | 26.02.2020 | TR | 26.02.2020 | BG | 26.05.2020 | GR | 27.05.2020 | IS | 26.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 05.05.2015 | |
AL | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 05.05.2015 | |
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3572339 (VOSS JOSEPH A, et al) [Y] 7 * column 3, line 45 - column 7, line 22 * * figures 1-8 *; | [Y]US3947017 (SERAGNOLI ENZO) [Y] 1-15 * column 2, line 32 - column 4, line 28 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US3958501 (RICHARDS FRANK P) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, line 44 - column 4, line 43 * * figures 1-8 *; | [Y]EP0281206 (SHIKOKU KAKOKI CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 10-13 * column 2, line 18 - column 4, line 14 ** figures 1-8 *; | [Y]US6343460 (FUJIKAWA YASUJI [JP], et al) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0051] * * figures 1-10 *; | [YD]EP1188542 (CURTI COSTRUZIONI MECCANICHE S [IT]) [YD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6601841 (WERNER TODD C [US]) [Y] 4 * column 4, line 53 - column 8, line 6 * * figures 1-11 *; | [Y]EP1451084 (GD SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 1-16 *; | [Y]DE102007044827 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0053] * * figures 1-6 * | by applicant | EP1188542 |