EP3462640 - ASYMMETRIC TDD IN FLEXIBLE USE SPECTRUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DBSD Satellite Services G.P. 11700 Plaza America Drive, Suite 1010 Reston, Virginia 20190 / US | [2019/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOROND, Mariam 11422 Heritage Oak Court Reston, Virginia 20194 / US | 02 /
COREA, Peter 4626 Latrobe Place Alexandria, Virginia 22311 / US | 03 /
HYSLOP, Doug 10303 Vale Road Vienna, Virginia 22181 / US | 04 /
PETERS, Tom 6534 El Nido Drive McLean, Virginia 22101 / US | [2020/09] |
Former [2019/14] | 01 /
SOROND, Mariam 11422 Heritage Oak Court Reston, VA Virginia 20194 / US | ||
02 /
COREA, Peter 4626 Latrobe Place Alexandria, VA Virginia 22311 / US | |||
03 /
HYSLOP, Doug 10303 Vale Road Vienna, VA Virginia 22181 / US | |||
04 /
PETERS, Tom 6534 El Nido Drive McLean, VA Virginia 22101 / US | Representative(s) | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf Patentanwalt Attorney at Law PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/14] | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf PartG mbB Patentanwälte Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18201145.2 | 13.11.2009 | [2019/14] | Priority number, date | US20080270946 | 14.11.2008 Original published format: US 270946 | [2019/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3462640 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3462640 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04W28/18 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
H04B7/2615 (EP,US);
H04L5/14 (US);
H04J3/22 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/14] | Title | German: | ASYMMETRISCHES TDD IN EINEM FLEXIBLEN NUTZUNGSSPEKTRUM | [2019/14] | English: | ASYMMETRIC TDD IN FLEXIBLE USE SPECTRUM | [2019/14] | French: | TDD ASYMÉTRIQUE DANS UN SPECTRE À UTILISATION FLEXIBLE | [2019/14] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/14] | 01.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09764120.3 / EP2359499 | EP18163866.9 / EP3361652 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2009 | AT | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | CZ | 26.02.2020 | DK | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | ES | 26.02.2020 | HR | 26.02.2020 | IT | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MC | 26.02.2020 | MK | 26.02.2020 | MT | 26.02.2020 | NL | 26.02.2020 | PL | 26.02.2020 | RO | 26.02.2020 | SI | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | SM | 26.02.2020 | TR | 26.02.2020 | BG | 26.05.2020 | NO | 26.05.2020 | GR | 27.05.2020 | IS | 26.06.2020 | PT | 19.07.2020 | IE | 13.11.2020 | LU | 13.11.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 13.11.2009 | |
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
IE | 13.11.2020 | ||
LU | 13.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
IE | 13.11.2020 | ||
LU | 13.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 13.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | NO | 26.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2004165547 (LOPES LUIS [GB]) [X] 1,15 * paragraphs [0027] - [0028]; figures 1,3 * [A] 2-14; | [A]US2006077931 (LEE YEON-WOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0030] - [0036]; figures 4-5 *; | [XA]US2006126546 (LEE YEON-WOO [KR], et al) [X] 1,15 * paragraph [0053]; figure 8 * [A] 2-14; | [XA]US2007286156 (GORMLEY EAMONN F [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * figures 2,7,8 * [A] 2-14 | by applicant | US20070797048 |