EP3480848 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES INCLUDING GATE ELECTRODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2019/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Kwang Soo 114-401, 277, Dongtanbanseok-ro Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18447 / KR | 02 /
JUNG, Young Jin D-2804, 200, Dongtanjungang-ro Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18445 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Jae Duk 211-101, 143, Jeongja-ro, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13608 / KR | [2019/19] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2019/19] | Application number, filing date | 18203087.4 | 29.10.2018 | [2019/19] | Priority number, date | KR20170145848 | 03.11.2017 Original published format: KR 20170145848 | [2019/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3480848 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/11519, H01L27/11548, H01L27/1156, H01L27/11565, H01L27/11575, H01L27/11582 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
H10B41/10 (EP,US);
H01L29/732 (KR);
H10B51/20 (US);
H01L27/0207 (US);
H01L29/1037 (US);
H01L29/41775 (KR);
H01L29/42312 (KR);
H01L29/4234 (US);
H01L29/66666 (KR);
H10B41/20 (US);
H10B41/27 (US);
H10B41/30 (US);
H10B41/40 (US);
H10B41/50 (EP,US);
H10B41/70 (EP,US);
H10B43/10 (EP,US);
H10B43/20 (US);
H10B43/27 (EP,US);
H10B43/30 (US);
H10B43/50 (EP,US);
H10B51/30 (US);
H10B51/50 (US);
H01L21/0337 (US);
H01L21/31144 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] |
Former [2019/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREIDIMENSIONALE HALBLEITERBAUELEMENTE MIT GATE-ELEKTRODEN | [2019/19] | English: | THREE-DIMENSIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES INCLUDING GATE ELECTRODES | [2019/19] | French: | DISPOSITIFS À SEMICONDUCTEUR TRIDIMENSIONNELS COMPORTANT DES ÉLECTRODES DE GRILLE | [2019/19] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 04.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US9230984 (TAKEGUCHI NAOKI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1A *; | [A]US2016240547 (TAGAMI MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2017207232 (YOU JANG HYUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI]US2017263618 (SHIMOJO YOSHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,11-14 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0083]; figure 12 * [I] 3,6,8-10,15 |