EP3496423 - HEARING DEVICE AND METHOD WITH INTELLIGENT STEERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2020 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GN Hearing A/S Lautrupbjerg 7 2750 Ballerup / DK | [2019/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MA, Changxue c/o GN Hearing A/S, Att: Group IPR Lautrupbjerg 7 DK-2750 Ballerup / DK | 02 /
DE VRIES, Rob c/o GN Hearing A/S, Att: Group IPR Lautrupbjerg 7 DK-2750 Ballerup / DK | 03 /
DITTBERNER, Andrew c/o GN Hearing A/S, Att: Group IPR Lautrupbjerg 7 DK-2750 Ballerup / DK | [2019/24] | Representative(s) | Aera A/S Niels Hemmingsens Gade 10, 5th Floor 1153 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2019/24] | Aera A/S Gammel Kongevej 60, 18th floor 1850 Frederiksberg C / DK | Application number, filing date | 18204484.2 | 06.11.2018 | [2019/24] | Priority number, date | US201715832641 | 05.12.2017 Original published format: US201715832641 | [2019/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3496423 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
H04R25/407 (EP,US);
H04R25/405 (US);
H04R25/43 (EP,US);
H04R25/505 (US);
H04R25/552 (EP,US);
H04R25/554 (US);
H04R25/60 (US);
H04R2225/41 (EP,US);
H04R2225/51 (US);
H04R2430/20 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] |
Former [2019/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÖRGERÄT UND -VERFAHREN MIT INTELLIGENTER STEUERUNG | [2019/24] | English: | HEARING DEVICE AND METHOD WITH INTELLIGENT STEERING | [2019/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF AUDITIF ET PROCÉDÉ AVEC DIRECTION INTELLIGENTE | [2019/24] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/03] | 12.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.07.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | Appeal following examination | 30.09.2022 | Appeal received No. T0102/23 | 30.09.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 07.12.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.05.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6154552 (KOROLJOW WALTER S [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9,11-16 * column 3, line 49 - column 6, line 63; figures 1, 2 ** column 11, line 47 - column 12, line 6; figure 13 *; | [X]US2013329923 (BOUSE VACLAV [DE]) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0002] , [0059] - [0067] - [0071] - [0077]; figures 1-3, 9 * |