EP3650960 - METHOD FOR BROADCASTING A MESSAGE BY A WATCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tissot S.A. Chemin des Tourelles 17 2400 Le Locle / CH | [2020/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANZI, Edoardo CSEM Route de Cheseaux 5 1400 Cheseaux-Noréaz / CH | 02 /
PORRET, Alain-Serge Rue de La Côte 33 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2020/20] | Representative(s) | ICB SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital, 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2020/20] | Application number, filing date | 18205006.2 | 07.11.2018 | [2020/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3650960 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G04G21/00, G06F3/01 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
G04G21/00 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/7243 (CN);
G06F3/016 (EP,US);
G04B25/02 (KR);
G04R60/00 (KR);
G06F1/163 (EP,US);
H04B1/385 (CN);
H04M1/72436 (CN);
H04M1/72448 (CN);
H04B2001/3861 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] |
Former [2020/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBREITUNG EINER NACHRICHT DURCH EINE ARMBANDUHR | [2020/20] | English: | METHOD FOR BROADCASTING A MESSAGE BY A WATCH | [2020/20] | French: | PROCEDE DE DIFFUSION D'UN MESSAGE PAR UNE MONTRE | [2020/20] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 13.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2015154853 (YOUSEF KHARSIM [KR], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0068] * * figures 4-10 *; | [X]EP2945133 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0092] *; | [X]CN105336204 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE INTERIOR WUHU CO LTD) [X] 1-11* the whole document *; | [X]WO2017177409 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document * |