blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3657605

EP3657605 - TERMINAL BLOCK WITH LATERAL ELASTIC HANDLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.03.2022
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.12.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.07.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.08.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  24.04.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 22.05.2024  [2024/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dinkle Enterprise Co., Ltd.
No. 19, Wuquan 2nd Road
Wugu District
New Taipei City 24890 / TW
For all designated states
Dinkle Electric Machinery (China) Co., Ltd.
258 Xingpu Middle Road
Zhipu Town
Kunshan Jiangsu 215343 / CN
[2020/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Wu, Shang-Tsai
DINKLE ENTERPRISE CO., LTD.
No. 19, Wuquan 2nd Rd. Wugu Dist.
24890 New Taipei City / TW
 [2020/22]
Representative(s)2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel
Partnerschaft mbB
Schumannstrasse 27
60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2022/16]Bals & Vogel Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Konrad-Zuse-Str. 4
44801 Bochum / DE
Former [2020/22]Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel
Universitätsstrasse 142
44799 Bochum / DE
Application number, filing date18207842.822.11.2018
[2020/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3657605
Date:27.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3657605
Date:20.04.2022
Language:EN
[2022/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:H01R4/48, H01R13/11
[2020/22]
CPC:
H01R4/48455 (EP); H01R13/112 (EP); H01R4/48365 (EP);
H01R9/2491 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/38]
Former [2020/22]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:KLEMMLEISTE MIT SEITLICHEN ELASTISCHEN GRIFFEN[2020/22]
English:TERMINAL BLOCK WITH LATERAL ELASTIC HANDLES[2020/22]
French:BLOC TERMINAL À MANCHES ÉLASTIQUES LATÉRAUX[2020/22]
Examination procedure30.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.08.2020Examination requested  [2020/38]
07.08.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.07.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.09.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2022Fee for grant paid
09.03.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.03.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.01.2023  25.01.2023  ADMISSIBLE
Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG
Flachsmarktstrasse 8
32825 Blomberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Gesthuysen Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Huyssenallee 68
45128 Essen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2023/09]
Opponent(s)01  20.01.2023  25.01.2023  ADMISSIBLE
Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG
Flachsmarktstrasse 8
32825 Blomberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Gesthuysen Patentanwälte
Patentanwälte
Huyssenallee 100
45128 Essen / DE
03.02.2023Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.06.2023Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.11.2018
AL20.04.2022
AT20.04.2022
CY20.04.2022
CZ20.04.2022
DK20.04.2022
EE20.04.2022
ES20.04.2022
FI20.04.2022
HR20.04.2022
LT20.04.2022
LV20.04.2022
MC20.04.2022
NL20.04.2022
PL20.04.2022
RO20.04.2022
RS20.04.2022
SE20.04.2022
SI20.04.2022
SK20.04.2022
SM20.04.2022
BG20.07.2022
NO20.07.2022
GR21.07.2022
IS20.08.2022
PT22.08.2022
GB22.11.2022
IE22.11.2022
LU22.11.2022
BE30.11.2022
CH30.11.2022
FR30.11.2022
LI30.11.2022
[2024/21]
Former [2024/18]HU22.11.2018
AL20.04.2022
AT20.04.2022
CZ20.04.2022
DK20.04.2022
EE20.04.2022
ES20.04.2022
FI20.04.2022
HR20.04.2022
LT20.04.2022
LV20.04.2022
MC20.04.2022
NL20.04.2022
PL20.04.2022
RO20.04.2022
RS20.04.2022
SE20.04.2022
SI20.04.2022
SK20.04.2022
SM20.04.2022
BG20.07.2022
NO20.07.2022
GR21.07.2022
IS20.08.2022
PT22.08.2022
GB22.11.2022
IE22.11.2022
LU22.11.2022
BE30.11.2022
CH30.11.2022
FR30.11.2022
LI30.11.2022
Former [2023/52]AL20.04.2022
AT20.04.2022
CZ20.04.2022
DK20.04.2022
EE20.04.2022
ES20.04.2022
FI20.04.2022
HR20.04.2022
LT20.04.2022
LV20.04.2022
MC20.04.2022
NL20.04.2022
PL20.04.2022
RO20.04.2022
RS20.04.2022
SE20.04.2022
SI20.04.2022
SK20.04.2022
SM20.04.2022
BG20.07.2022
NO20.07.2022
GR21.07.2022
IS20.08.2022
PT22.08.2022
GB22.11.2022
IE22.11.2022
LU22.11.2022
BE30.11.2022
CH30.11.2022
FR30.11.2022
LI30.11.2022
Former [2023/49]AL20.04.2022
AT20.04.2022
CZ20.04.2022
DK20.04.2022
EE20.04.2022
ES20.04.2022
FI20.04.2022
HR20.04.2022
LT20.04.2022
LV20.04.2022
MC20.04.2022
NL20.04.2022
PL20.04.2022
RO20.04.2022
RS20.04.2022
SE20.04.2022
SI20.04.2022
SK20.04.2022
SM20.04.2022
BG20.07.2022
NO20.07.2022
GR21.07.2022
IS20.08.2022
PT22.08.2022
GB22.11.2022
IE22.11.2022
LU22.11.2022
BE30.11.2022
CH30.11.2022
LI30.11.2022
Former [2023/48]AL20.04.2022
AT20.04.2022
CZ20.04.2022
DK20.04.2022
EE20.04.2022
ES20.04.2022
FI20.04.2022
HR20.04.2022
LT20.04.2022
LV20.04.2022
MC20.04.2022
NL20.04.2022
PL20.04.2022
RO20.04.2022
RS20.04.2022
SE20.04.2022
SI20.04.2022
SK20.04.2022
SM20.04.2022
BG20.07.2022
NO20.07.2022
GR21.07.2022
IS20.08.2022
PT22.08.2022
GB22.11.2022
IE22.11.2022
LU22.11.2022
CH30.11.2022
LI30.11.2022
Former [2023/47]AL20.04.2022
AT20.04.2022
CZ20.04.2022
DK20.04.2022
EE20.04.2022
ES20.04.2022
FI20.04.2022
HR20.04.2022
LT20.04.2022
LV20.04.2022
MC20.04.2022
NL20.04.2022
PL20.04.2022
RO20.04.2022
RS20.04.2022
SE20.04.2022
SI20.04.2022
SK20.04.2022
SM20.04.2022
BG20.07.2022
NO20.07.2022
GR21.07.2022
IS20.08.2022
PT22.08.2022
GB22.11.2022
LU22.11.2022
CH30.11.2022
LI30.11.2022
Former [2023/37]AL20.04.2022
AT20.04.2022
CZ20.04.2022
DK20.04.2022
EE20.04.2022
ES20.04.2022
FI20.04.2022
HR20.04.2022
LT20.04.2022
LV20.04.2022
MC20.04.2022
NL20.04.2022
PL20.04.2022
RO20.04.2022
RS20.04.2022
SE20.04.2022
SI20.04.2022
SK20.04.2022
SM20.04.2022
BG20.07.2022
NO20.07.2022
GR21.07.2022
IS20.08.2022
PT22.08.2022
LU22.11.2022
CH30.11.2022
LI30.11.2022
Former [2023/35]AL20.04.2022
AT20.04.2022
CZ20.04.2022
DK20.04.2022
EE20.04.2022
ES20.04.2022
FI20.04.2022
HR20.04.2022
LT20.04.2022
LV20.04.2022
MC20.04.2022
NL20.04.2022
PL20.04.2022
RO20.04.2022
RS20.04.2022
SE20.04.2022
SI20.04.2022
SK20.04.2022
SM20.04.2022
BG20.07.2022
NO20.07.2022
GR21.07.2022
IS20.08.2022
PT22.08.2022
CH30.11.2022
LI30.11.2022
Former [2023/31]AL20.04.2022
AT20.04.2022
CZ20.04.2022
DK20.04.2022
EE20.04.2022
ES20.04.2022
FI20.04.2022
HR20.04.2022
LT20.04.2022
LV20.04.2022
MC20.04.2022
NL20.04.2022
PL20.04.2022
RO20.04.2022
RS20.04.2022
SE20.04.2022
SI20.04.2022
SK20.04.2022
SM20.04.2022
BG20.07.2022
NO20.07.2022
GR21.07.2022
IS20.08.2022
PT22.08.2022
Former [2023/25]AL20.04.2022
AT20.04.2022
CZ20.04.2022
DK20.04.2022
EE20.04.2022
ES20.04.2022
FI20.04.2022
HR20.04.2022
LT20.04.2022
LV20.04.2022
NL20.04.2022
PL20.04.2022
RO20.04.2022
RS20.04.2022
SE20.04.2022
SI20.04.2022
SK20.04.2022
SM20.04.2022
BG20.07.2022
NO20.07.2022
GR21.07.2022
IS20.08.2022
PT22.08.2022
Former [2023/17]AL20.04.2022
AT20.04.2022
CZ20.04.2022
DK20.04.2022
EE20.04.2022
ES20.04.2022
FI20.04.2022
HR20.04.2022
LT20.04.2022
LV20.04.2022
NL20.04.2022
PL20.04.2022
RO20.04.2022
RS20.04.2022
SE20.04.2022
SK20.04.2022
SM20.04.2022
BG20.07.2022
NO20.07.2022
GR21.07.2022
IS20.08.2022
PT22.08.2022
Former [2023/09]AT20.04.2022
CZ20.04.2022
DK20.04.2022
EE20.04.2022
ES20.04.2022
FI20.04.2022
HR20.04.2022
LT20.04.2022
LV20.04.2022
NL20.04.2022
PL20.04.2022
RO20.04.2022
RS20.04.2022
SE20.04.2022
SK20.04.2022
SM20.04.2022
BG20.07.2022
NO20.07.2022
GR21.07.2022
IS20.08.2022
PT22.08.2022
Former [2023/07]AT20.04.2022
DK20.04.2022
ES20.04.2022
FI20.04.2022
HR20.04.2022
LT20.04.2022
LV20.04.2022
NL20.04.2022
PL20.04.2022
RS20.04.2022
SE20.04.2022
BG20.07.2022
NO20.07.2022
GR21.07.2022
IS20.08.2022
PT22.08.2022
Former [2022/51]AT20.04.2022
ES20.04.2022
FI20.04.2022
HR20.04.2022
LT20.04.2022
LV20.04.2022
NL20.04.2022
PL20.04.2022
RS20.04.2022
SE20.04.2022
BG20.07.2022
NO20.07.2022
GR21.07.2022
IS20.08.2022
PT22.08.2022
Former [2022/50]AT20.04.2022
ES20.04.2022
FI20.04.2022
HR20.04.2022
LT20.04.2022
LV20.04.2022
NL20.04.2022
PL20.04.2022
RS20.04.2022
SE20.04.2022
BG20.07.2022
NO20.07.2022
GR21.07.2022
PT22.08.2022
Former [2022/49]AT20.04.2022
ES20.04.2022
FI20.04.2022
HR20.04.2022
LT20.04.2022
LV20.04.2022
NL20.04.2022
SE20.04.2022
BG20.07.2022
NO20.07.2022
GR21.07.2022
PT22.08.2022
Former [2022/47]AT20.04.2022
ES20.04.2022
FI20.04.2022
LT20.04.2022
NL20.04.2022
SE20.04.2022
NO20.07.2022
PT22.08.2022
Former [2022/44]NL20.04.2022
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3743410  (ELECTRO TERMINAL GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-17 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 78; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP1094551  (ELECTRO TERMINAL GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0019]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE19949387  (ELECTRO TERMINAL GMBH [AT], et al) [A] 1-17* line 54, paragraph 27 - column 9, line 54; figure 1 *;
 [XYI]US9397444  (WU SHANG-TSAI [TW]) [X] 1-3,5,7-13 * column 3, line 25 - column 5, line 4; figures 1-5 * [Y] 6 [I] 4,14-17;
 [YA]US9466897  (WU SHANG-TSAI [TW]) [Y] 6 * column 3, line 53 - line 63; figure 2 * [A] 1
ExaminationDE3743410
 DE19949387
OppositionEP0246199
 DE3743410
 EP1094551
 US2012029549
 US9397444
 US9466897
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.