EP3660860 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A DISPLAY UNIT IN A MEDICAL DEVICE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthineers AG Siemensstraße 3 91301 Forchheim / DE | [2024/07] |
Former [2020/23] | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare GmbH Henkestraße 127 91052 Erlangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofmann, Bernd Egidienstr. 58 91058 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Kaup, Ina Jäckelstraße 24 91052 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
Ullrich, Christian Mögeldorfer Hauptstraße 31 90482 Nürnberg / DE | [2020/23] | Representative(s) | Siemens Healthineers Patent Attorneys Siemens Healthcare GmbH SHS TE IP Henkestraße 127 91052 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 18208622.3 | 27.11.2018 | [2020/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3660860 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G16H40/63, G16H40/67 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
G16H40/63 (EP);
G16H40/67 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] |
Former [2020/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINER ANZEIGEEINHEIT IN EINEM MEDIZINTECHNISCHEN GERÄTESYSTEM | [2020/23] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A DISPLAY UNIT IN A MEDICAL DEVICE SYSTEM | [2020/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'UNE UNITÉ D'AFFICHAGE DANS UN SYSTÈME D'APPAREILS MÉDICOTECHNIQUE | [2020/23] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 30.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 03.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014204190 (ROSENBLATT III PETER L [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0140] * * paragraph [0212] - paragraph [0262] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0069] *; | [X]US2014222462 (SHAKIL IAN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] ** paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0090]; figures 7,8; table 1 *; | [X]US2018247023 (DIVINE LUCAS JASON [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0128] * |