EP3667256 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING ULTRASONIC MEASUREMENTS OF FLUID PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN GROENESTIJN, Gert-Jan Adriaan c/o TNO IP & Contracting Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | 02 /
VAN NEER, Paul Louis Maria Joseph c/o TNO IP & Contracting Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | 03 /
WIERINGA, Fokko Pieter c/o TNO IP & Contracting Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | 04 /
VOLKER, Arno Willem Frederik c/o TNO IP & Contracting Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | 05 /
CHENG, Lun Kai c/o TNO IP & Contracting Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18212682.1 | 14.12.2018 | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3667256 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/66 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
G01F1/661 (EP,US);
G01F1/662 (US);
G01F1/667 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON ULTRASCHALLMESSUNGEN VON FLÜSSIGKEITSEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2020/25] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING ULTRASONIC MEASUREMENTS OF FLUID PROPERTIES | [2020/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'EFFECTUER DES MESURES ULTRASONIQUES DE PROPRIÉTÉS DE FLUIDE | [2020/25] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/24] | 26.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6644128 (BYATT ANTHONY [CH], et al) [Y] 3-5,12-14,16-18 * figure 1 *; | [XY]US2016298445 (AL-KHALIFA MOHAMMED [SA], et al) [X] 1,2,6-11 * figures 1,2 * [Y] 3-5,12-18; | [Y] - XIAOLONG DONG ET AL, "Multipoint fiber-optic laser-ultrasound generation along a fiber based on the core-offset splicing of fibers", PHOTONICS RESEARCH, (20170614), vol. 5, no. 4, doi:10.1364/PRJ.5.000287, page 287, XP055593751 [Y] 3,4,12,13,15-18 * figures 1(a),1(b),3(a) * * 1st paragraph of section 2 (Working Principle and Fab rication); page 288, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/PRJ.5.000287 |