EP3502874 - SOFTWARE VERSION SYNCHRONIZATION FOR AVIONICS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation Four Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEIBHAM, Terrence R. 41W108 Bridle Creek Drive St. Charles, IL Illinois 60175 / US | 02 /
HANSON, Michael J. 4335 Eaton Drive Rockford, IL Illinois 61114 / US | 03 /
REITER, Dave Mailstop 190-6 4747 Harison Avenue Rockford, IL Illinois 61125-7002 / US | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2024/04] |
Former [2019/26] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 18214141.6 | 19.12.2018 | [2019/26] | Priority number, date | US201715848430 | 20.12.2017 Original published format: US201715848430 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3502874 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3502874 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F8/65, G06F8/71, G06F8/654, G06F11/14, G06F11/16, G06F9/445 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
G06F8/71 (EP,US);
B64D47/00 (US);
G06F11/1004 (US);
G06F11/1417 (EP,US);
G06F11/1433 (EP,US);
G06F11/1666 (EP,US);
G06F8/65 (EP,US);
G06F8/654 (EP,US);
G06F9/44536 (EP,US);
B64D2221/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] |
Former [2019/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SOFTWARE-VERSION-SYNCHRONISIERUNG FÜR AVIONIKSYSTEME | [2019/26] | English: | SOFTWARE VERSION SYNCHRONIZATION FOR AVIONICS SYSTEMS | [2019/26] | French: | SYNCHRONISATION DE VERSION LOGICIELLE POUR SYSTÈMES AVIONIQUES | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 30.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010077195 (ALTSTAEDT KAI [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0012] - [ 0039] - [0064] * [I] 7-11,13-15; | [XI]US2013305238 (FRAYSSIGNES ANNE [FR], et al) [X] 1,4-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0056] * [I] 2,3,7-15; | [A] - ECKLUND R ET AL, "Lifecycle operational flight program (OFP) loading support for the C-17 globemaster III weapon system", 2001 IEEE AUTOTESTCON PROCEEDINGS. IEEE SYSTEMS READINESS TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. AUTOTESTCON 2001. VALLEY FORGE, PA, AUG. 20 - 23, 2001; [IEEE AUTOTESTCON PROCEEDINGS: IEEE SYSTEMS READINESS TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20010820), vol. CONF. 37, doi:10.1109/AUTEST.2001.949476, ISBN 978-0-7803-7094-4, pages 962 - 976, XP010556164 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [ 4.4] , [ 4.7] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AUTEST.2001.949476 |