EP3501954 - SINGLE-PIECE FLOOR STRUCTURE MADE OF A COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, MK, PT | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie Plastic Omnium 19 Boulevard Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/26] | For all designated states Compagnie Plastic Omnium 19 boulevard Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUILLARD, Pierre 47, rue Paul Arcis 69330 Meyzieu / FR | 02 /
PIERROT, Frédéric 101 chemin des Abbéanches 01500 Amberieu en Bugey / FR | 03 /
MASSON, Sébastien 3 rue Vie Borgne 38460 CREMIEU / FR | [2019/35] |
Former [2019/26] | 01 /
JUILLARD, Pierre 37 rue de l'Egalité 69150 DECINES-CHARPIEU / FR | ||
02 /
PIERROT, Frédéric 101 chemin des Abbéanches 01500 Amberieu en Bugey / FR | |||
03 /
MASSON, Sébastien 3 rue Vie Borgne 38460 CREMIEU / FR | Representative(s) | LLR 2, rue Jean Lantier 75001 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/33] | LLR 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2019/26] | LLR 11, boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 18215272.8 | 21.12.2018 | [2019/26] | Priority number, date | FR20170063067 | 22.12.2017 Original published format: FR 1763067 | [2019/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3501954 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3501954 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/20, B62D29/04 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
B62D25/20 (EP,CN);
B62D29/04 (EP);
B62D29/043 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] |
Former [2019/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Validation states | MA | 21.12.2018 | Title | German: | EINTEILIGE BODENSTRUKTUR AUS VERBUNDMATERIAL | [2019/26] | English: | SINGLE-PIECE FLOOR STRUCTURE MADE OF A COMPOSITE MATERIAL | [2019/26] | French: | STRUCTURE DE PLANCHER MONO-PIÈCE EN MATIÈRE COMPOSITE | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 13.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2018 | AL | 12.08.2020 | AT | 12.08.2020 | CY | 12.08.2020 | CZ | 12.08.2020 | DK | 12.08.2020 | EE | 12.08.2020 | ES | 12.08.2020 | FI | 12.08.2020 | HR | 12.08.2020 | IT | 12.08.2020 | LT | 12.08.2020 | LV | 12.08.2020 | MC | 12.08.2020 | MK | 12.08.2020 | MT | 12.08.2020 | NL | 12.08.2020 | PL | 12.08.2020 | PT | 12.08.2020 | RO | 12.08.2020 | RS | 12.08.2020 | SE | 12.08.2020 | SI | 12.08.2020 | SK | 12.08.2020 | SM | 12.08.2020 | TR | 12.08.2020 | BG | 12.11.2020 | NO | 12.11.2020 | GR | 13.11.2020 | IS | 12.12.2020 | IE | 21.12.2020 | LU | 21.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 21.12.2018 | |
AL | 12.08.2020 | ||
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CY | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
MT | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
TR | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
IE | 21.12.2020 | ||
LU | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
IE | 21.12.2020 | ||
LU | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 12.08.2020 | |
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 12.08.2020 | |
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 12.08.2020 | |
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008040920 (RENAULT SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2009179461 (FUCHS JOHN P [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0036]; figure - *; | [A]DE102012008853 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 1,6,12-14* figure -; claim - *; | [XAI]DE102012010463 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6,14 * figures 1-3,7,8 * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038] * [A] 4,8-11,13 [I] 7,12 |