EP3506159 - CAMERA APPARATUS FOR GENERATING MACHINE VISION DATA AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Insitu, Inc. (a Subsidiary Of The Boeing Company) 118 East Columbia River Way Bingen, Washington 98605 / US | [2019/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, David Elliott 118 East Columbia River Way Bingen, WA 98605 / US | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | St Clair Jones, Gregory Arthur Langley, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2019/27] | Application number, filing date | 18215889.9 | 24.12.2018 | [2019/27] | Priority number, date | US201862613046P | 02.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862613046 P | US201816161786 | 16.10.2018 Original published format: US201816161786 | [2019/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3506159 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G08B13/196, G06K9/20 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
G08B13/19643 (EP,US);
G06V10/147 (EP,US);
G06V20/10 (CN);
G06V20/52 (EP,US);
H04N23/54 (US);
H04N23/90 (US);
H04N7/181 (CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAMERAVORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON DATEN DES MASCHINELLEN SEHEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2019/27] | English: | CAMERA APPARATUS FOR GENERATING MACHINE VISION DATA AND RELATED METHODS | [2019/27] | French: | APPAREIL DE CAMÉRA POUR GÉNÉRER DES DONNÉES DE VISION ARTIFICIELLE ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2019/27] | Examination procedure | 24.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 12.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011063446 (MCMORDIE DAVID [CA], et al) [X] 1-7,9-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0 22] - [0028] - [0 37] - [0039] - [0 51] - [0054] * [I] 8,12,13; | [A]US2011157367 (CHANG JEN-TSORNG [TW]) [A] 1-13 * abstract ** paragraphs [0010] - [0012] - [0 23] *; | [A] - NAGAHARA H ET AL, "Dual-sensor camera for acquiring image sequences with different spatio-temporal resolution", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE CONFERENCE ON ADVANCED VIDEO AND SIGNAL BASED SURVEILLANCE, 2005. COMO, ITALY SEPT. 15-16, 2005, (20050915), doi:10.1109/AVSS.2005.1577311, ISBN 978-0-7803-9385-1, pages 450 - 455, XP010881218 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * section 1 * * section 5.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AVSS.2005.1577311 |