EP3606069 - MULTIPLE REFERENCE INTRA PREDICTION USING VARIABLE WEIGHTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital VC Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Racape, Fabien c/o Thomson Licensing 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 35576 CESSON-SÉVIGNÉ / FR | 02 /
Rath, Gagan c/o Thomson Licensing 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 35576 CESSON-SÉVIGNÉ / FR | 03 /
Urban, Fabrice c/o Thomson Licensing 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 35576 CESSON-SÉVIGNÉ / FR | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Huchet, Anne, et al InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 20, rue Rouget de Lisle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18306061.5 | 03.08.2018 | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3606069 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/11, H04N19/147, H04N19/176 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
H04N19/11 (EP);
H04N19/147 (EP);
H04N19/176 (EP);
H04N19/105 (EP);
H04N19/157 (EP);
H04N19/182 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRFACHREFERENZ-INTRA-PRÄDIKTION MIT VARIABLEN GEWICHTEN | [2020/06] | English: | MULTIPLE REFERENCE INTRA PREDICTION USING VARIABLE WEIGHTS | [2020/06] | French: | PRÉDICTION INTRA-PRÉDICTIVE À RÉFÉRENCES MULTIPLES UTILISANT DES POIDS VARIABLES | [2020/06] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/02] | 26.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2017190288 (MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 96 * * paragraphs [0056] , [ 0138] , [ 0149] * * paragraph [0163] - paragraph [0173] * * paragraph [0226] - paragraph [0251] * * paragraph [0311] - paragraph [0328] *; | [A]US2017347103 (YU YUE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0094] *; | [A]US2018048889 (ZHANG LI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraph [0193] - paragraph [0194] *; | [A] - VAN DER AUWERA (QUALCOMM) G ET AL, "Description of Core Experiment 3 (CE3): Intra Prediction and Mode Coding", no. JVET-J1023, (20180621), 10. JVET MEETING; 20180410 - 20180420; SAN DIEGO; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/10_San Diego/wg11/JVET-J1023-v3.zip JVET-J1023r2_with_markups.docx, (20180621), XP030198638 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Section 9 * | [A] - VAN DER AUWERA (QUALCOMM) G ET AL, "CE3: Summary Report on Intra Prediction and Mode Coding", no. JVET-K0023, (20180711), 11. JVET MEETING; 20180711 - 20180718; LJUBLJANA; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/11_Ljubljana/wg11/JVET-K0023-v3.zip JVET-K0023_v3.docx, (20180711), XP030199387 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Section 8.1 * |