EP3643431 - COMPONENTS HAVING LOW ASPECT RATIO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation 2730 West Tyvola Road Four Coliseum Centre Charlotte, NC 28277 / US | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mironets, Sergey UTC Aerospace Systems Wroc aw sp. z o.o. Widawska 33 51-188 Szymanow / PL | 02 /
Wentland, William Louis UTC Aerospace Systems Wroc aw sp. z o.o. 4401 Dorset Dr Rockford, IL 61114 / US | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/18] | Application number, filing date | 18461620.9 | 27.10.2018 | [2020/18] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3643431 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/105, B22F5/08, B30B11/02, // B22F3/02, B22F3/10 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
B22F5/08 (EP,US);
B22F10/28 (EP,US);
B22F3/105 (EP);
B22F3/14 (US);
B30B11/027 (EP);
B33Y10/00 (US);
B33Y40/00 (EP);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F10/28, B22F3/105 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] |
Former [2020/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMPONENTEN MIT GERINGEM ASPEKTVERHÄLTNIS | [2020/18] | English: | COMPONENTS HAVING LOW ASPECT RATIO | [2020/18] | French: | COMPOSANTS PRÉSENTANT UN FAIBLE RAPPORT D'ASPECT | [2020/18] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 29.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH1171602 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [X] 15 * paragraph [0048] * * figures 1-7, 12 *[A] 1-14; | [X]WO2011072961 (K4SINT S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1-12,14,15 * figures 13-17 * * page 5, line 10 - line 15 * * page 14, line 21 - page 17, line 2 *; | [XA]EP3315227 (HAMILTON SUNDSTRAND CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,10,11,13-15 * figures 1,3,4 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0 12] - paragraph [0015] * [A] 5-9,12 |