EP3612236 - COMBINATION THERAPY WITH AN ANTI-CD25 ANTIBODY-DRUG CONJUGATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADC Therapeutics SA Biopôle Route de la Corniche 3B 1066 Epalinges / CH | For all designated states Medimmune Limited Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB21 6GH / GB | [2020/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN BERKEL, Patricius Hendrikus Cornelis c/o ADC Therapeutics SA Biopôle route de la Corniche 3b 1066 Epalinges / CH | 02 /
SKELTON, Lisa c/o ADC Therapeutics SA Biopôle route de la Corniche 3b 1066 Epalinges / CH | 03 /
ZAMMARCHI, Francesca c/o ADC Therapeutics SA Biopôle route de la Corniche 3b 1066 Epalinges / CH | 04 /
FEINGOLD, Jay Marshall c/o ADC Therapeutics Americas 430 Mountain Ave. 4th Floor Murray Hill New Jersey 07947 / US | 05 /
WUERTHNER, Jens c/o ADC Therapeutics SA Biopôle route de la Corniche 3b 1066 Epalinges / CH | 06 /
HARTLEY, John c/o University College London Gower Street London WC1E 6BT / GB | [2020/09] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/09] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 18719542.5 | 20.04.2018 | [2020/09] | WO2018EP60214 | Priority number, date | GB20170006252 | 20.04.2017 Original published format: GB 201706252 | GB20170006251 | 20.04.2017 Original published format: GB 201706251 | GB20170006250 | 20.04.2017 Original published format: GB 201706250 | GB20170006249 | 20.04.2017 Original published format: GB 201706249 | GB20170006248 | 20.04.2017 Original published format: GB 201706248 | GB20170006247 | 20.04.2017 Original published format: GB 201706247 | GB20170006246 | 20.04.2017 Original published format: GB 201706246 | GB20170006245 | 20.04.2017 Original published format: GB 201706245 | GB20180005189 | 29.03.2018 Original published format: GB 201805189 | [2020/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018193104 | Date: | 25.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3612236 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/68, A61K31/7068, A61K39/395, A61K45/06, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, C07K16/24, C07K16/28 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
A61K47/6803 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6849 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/5517 (US);
A61K31/706 (KR);
A61K31/7068 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/7076 (KR,US);
A61K39/3955 (EP);
A61K39/39558 (KR);
A61K45/06 (EP,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61P35/02 (EP,KR);
C07K16/241 (EP,KR);
C07K16/2818 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/2827 (US);
C07K16/2878 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/7068, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/09] | A61K47/68, A61K31/7068, A61K45/06, A61P35/00, A61P35/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE MIT EINEM ANTI-CD25-ANTIKÖRPER-ARZNEIMITTELKONJUGAT | [2020/09] | English: | COMBINATION THERAPY WITH AN ANTI-CD25 ANTIBODY-DRUG CONJUGATE | [2020/09] | French: | POLYTHÉRAPIE AVEC UN CONJUGUÉ ANTICORPS-MÉDICAMENT ANTI-CD25 | [2020/09] | Entry into regional phase | 01.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 01.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 01.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Request for further processing for: | 25.09.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 25.09.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.10.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Date: | 24.06.2020 | ID: | 02 | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Date: | 07.10.2022 | [2023/01] |
Former [2020/47] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | ||
Date: | 24.06.2020 | ||
[2023/01] | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2014057119 (ADC THERAPEUTICS S RL [CH]) [X] 1-17,20-25,36-41 * page 13, line 26 - page 15, line 35 * * page 84, line 4 - page 87, line 21 * * page 88, lines 25-26 * * page 167, line 30 - page 168, line 12 * * page 169, line 20 - page 173, line 12 * * claims 1,2,100,101,103,109-117 * * page 194, lines 1-10 * * figures 3A,3C,4,5 * [Y] 1-42; | [XY]WO2016177438 (ADC THERAPEUTICS SA [CH]) [X] 1-25,36-41 * page 3, lines 25-29 * * page 71; compound ConjE * * page 84, line 33 - page 88, line 16 * * page 89, lines 20,21 * * page 105, line 15 - page 106, line 29 * * page 108, line 4 - page 112, line 10 * * claims 1,99,103,105,107,111,113,115-124 * * figures 1-6 * [Y] 1-42; | [Y] - M. J. FLYNN ET AL, "ADCT-301, a Pyrrolobenzodiazepine (PBD) Dimer-Containing Antibody-Drug Conjugate (ADC) Targeting CD25-Expressing Hematological Malignancies", MOLECULAR CANCER THERAPEUTICS, US, (20161101), vol. 15, no. 11, doi:10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-16-0233, ISSN 1535-7163, pages 2709 - 2721, XP055488025 [Y] 1-42 * abstract * * figure 1A * * page 2717, column r, paragraph 2 - page 2720, column l, line 22 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-16-0233 | [Y] - SMITHA MENON ET AL, "Advances in Cancer Immunotherapy in Solid Tumors", CANCERS, (20161124), vol. 8, no. 12, doi:10.3390/cancers8120106, pages 1 - 21, XP055488463 [Y] 1-42 * abstract * * table 1 * * page 6, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 12, paragraph 4 - page 15, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/cancers8120106 |