EP3619912 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR COLOR GAMUT MAPPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital VC Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2020/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THEBAULT, Cédric c/o Technicolor R&D France 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 02 /
STAUDER, Jürgen c/o Technicolor R&D France 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 03 /
MAZZANTE, Angelo c/o Technicolor R&D France 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | Interdigital Immeuble ZEN 2 845 A, avenue des Champs Blancs 35510 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [2023/45] |
Former [2020/11] | Rolland, Sophie InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 20, rue Rouget de Lisle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 18724789.5 | 26.04.2018 | [2020/11] | WO2018EP60702 | Priority number, date | EP20170305495 | 02.05.2017 Original published format: EP 17305495 | [2020/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018202531 | Date: | 08.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3619912 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3619912 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/60 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
H04N1/6061 (EP,KR);
H04N9/67 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/186 (US);
H04N19/46 (US);
H04N9/68 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FARBRAUMABBILDUNG | [2020/11] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR COLOR GAMUT MAPPING | [2020/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE MAPPAGE DE GAMME DE COULEURS | [2023/08] |
Former [2020/11] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN CORRESPONDANCE DE GAMME DE COULEURS | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/11] | 24.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2023 | CZ | 08.11.2023 | DK | 08.11.2023 | EE | 08.11.2023 | ES | 08.11.2023 | HR | 08.11.2023 | IT | 08.11.2023 | LT | 08.11.2023 | LV | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | RO | 08.11.2023 | RS | 08.11.2023 | SE | 08.11.2023 | SK | 08.11.2023 | SM | 08.11.2023 | BG | 08.02.2024 | NO | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | PT | 08.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
CZ | 08.11.2023 | ||
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP2375719 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]); | [A]EP3096510 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]); | [X]EP3110128 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]) |