EP3618664 - APPLICATOR FOR PASTY COSMETIC PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ripoli, Pablo Eugenio Av. Patricias Argentinas 2009 Barrio las Liebres Lote 225 1619 Garín, Escobar / AR | For all designated states Antonini, Luis Christian 11 Rue du Château 72330 La Fontaine Saint-Martin / FR | [2020/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIPOLI, Pablo Eugenio Av. Patricias Argentinas 2009 Barrio las Liebres Lote 225 1619 Garín, Escobar / AR | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | Wachinger, Julian Friedrich rwzh Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Barthstrasse 4 80339 München / DE | [2020/11] | Application number, filing date | 18725410.7 | 27.04.2018 | [2020/11] | WO2018EP60945 | Priority number, date | AR2017P101140 | 03.05.2017 Original published format: AR P170101140 | [2020/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018202591 | Date: | 08.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3618664 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3618664 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A45D40/00 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
A45D40/0087 (EP,US);
A45D2200/1027 (EP,US);
A45D2200/1036 (EP,US);
B65B9/023 (US);
B65D75/5855 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | APPLIKATOR FÜR DICKFLÜSSIGE KOSMETIKPRODUKTE | [2021/16] | English: | APPLICATOR FOR PASTY COSMETIC PRODUCTS | [2020/11] | French: | APPLICATEUR POUR PRODUITS COSMÉTIQUES PÂTEUX | [2021/16] |
Former [2020/11] | APPLIKATOR FÜR PASTÖSE KOSMETISCHE PRODUKTE | ||
Former [2020/11] | APPLICATEUR POUR PRODUITS COSMÉTIQUES PÂTEUX | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/11] | 29.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.04.2018 | AL | 08.09.2021 | AT | 08.09.2021 | CY | 08.09.2021 | CZ | 08.09.2021 | DK | 08.09.2021 | EE | 08.09.2021 | FI | 08.09.2021 | HR | 08.09.2021 | LT | 08.09.2021 | LV | 08.09.2021 | MC | 08.09.2021 | MK | 08.09.2021 | RO | 08.09.2021 | RS | 08.09.2021 | SE | 08.09.2021 | SI | 08.09.2021 | SK | 08.09.2021 | SM | 08.09.2021 | BG | 08.12.2021 | NO | 08.12.2021 | GR | 09.12.2021 | IS | 08.01.2022 | LU | 27.04.2022 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
MK | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
LU | 27.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
LU | 27.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
LU | 27.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 08.09.2021 | |
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 08.09.2021 | |
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 08.09.2021 | |
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 08.09.2021 | |
NO | 08.12.2021 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4372098 (MASON EDWIN W) [Y] 1-12 * column 1, line 14 - line 20 * * column 5 - column 10 * * abstract *; | [YD]EP1091666 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [YD] 1-12* abstract * | by applicant | EP0109166 | US4747782 | EP2594154 |