EP3645024 - SYNBIOTIC COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING FATTY LIVER DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/19] | SYNBIOTIC COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING METABOLIC DISORDERS | ||
[2022/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGELS, Eefje Uppsalalaan 12 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | 02 /
VAN LIMPT, Cornelus Johannes Petrus Uppsalalaan 12 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | 03 /
OOSTING, Annemarie Uppsalalaan 12 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | 04 /
OOZEER, Akhtar Raish Uppsalalaan 12 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | 05 /
KNOL, Jan Uppsalalaan 12 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | 06 /
MISCHKE, Mona Uppsalalaan 12 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2020/19] | Application number, filing date | 18733320.8 | 29.06.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018EP67706 | Priority number, date | EP20170179124 | 30.06.2017 Original published format: EP 17179124 | [2020/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019002609 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3645024 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3645024 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/745, A61K9/00, A61K31/715, A23L33/00, A23L33/135, A23L33/21, A61P3/06 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
A61K35/745 (EP,US);
A23L33/135 (EP,US);
A23L33/21 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/702 (US);
A61K31/715 (EP,US);
A61K9/0095 (EP,US);
A61P3/06 (US);
A61P3/10 (US);
A23V2002/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYMBIOTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR PRÄVENTION VON FETTLEBERERKRANKUNG | [2022/17] | English: | SYNBIOTIC COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING FATTY LIVER DISEASE | [2022/17] | French: | COMPOSITION SYMBIOTIQUE DE PRÉVENTION DE LA STÉATOSE HÉPATIQUE | [2022/17] |
Former [2020/19] | SYMBIOTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR PRÄVENTION VON METABOLISCHEN ERKRANKUNGEN | ||
Former [2020/19] | SYNBIOTIC COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING METABOLIC DISORDERS | ||
Former [2020/19] | COMPOSITION SYMBIOTIQUE POUR LA PRÉVENTION DE TROUBLES MÉTABOLIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 17.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.09.2022 | AT | 14.09.2022 | CZ | 14.09.2022 | DK | 14.09.2022 | EE | 14.09.2022 | ES | 14.09.2022 | FI | 14.09.2022 | HR | 14.09.2022 | LT | 14.09.2022 | LV | 14.09.2022 | MC | 14.09.2022 | PL | 14.09.2022 | RO | 14.09.2022 | RS | 14.09.2022 | SE | 14.09.2022 | SI | 14.09.2022 | SK | 14.09.2022 | SM | 14.09.2022 | NO | 14.12.2022 | GR | 15.12.2022 | IS | 14.01.2023 | PT | 16.01.2023 | [2024/09] |
Former [2023/37] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9949877 (GANEDEN BIOTECH INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * claims 1,7,13,30,37,39,60,62 *; | [YD]WO2006091103 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [YD] 1-13 * page 14; claims 1,13,16 *; | [Y]WO2008116700 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [Y] 1-13 * claims 1-11 *; | [Y]EP2143341 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0024]; claims 1,15,17 *; | [Y]EP2359838 (ARAGAN [FR]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0050] , [0072]; claim 14 *; | [Y]EP2452571 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0037]; claims 4,7,17-19 *; | [Y]WO2012153179 (PROBIOTICAL SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 1-13 * claims 1,2,5,11,12 *; | [Y]WO2013054002 (GUT GUIDE OY [FI]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0018]; example 3; claims 1-3 *; | [XYI]WO2015172191 (MEDLAB IP PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1,2,5,8,12,13 * paragraphs [0127] , [0129] , [0136]; claims 3-6 * [Y] 7 [I] 3,4,6,9-11; | [Y]WO2016020495 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [Y] 1-13 * page 18, paragraph 1 * * claims 1,8,10 *; | [Y]WO2016026684 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [Y] 1-13 * claims 1-11 *; | [Y]WO2017043963 (NUTRICIA NV [NL]) [Y] 1-13 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [XP]WO2017129649 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [XP] 1-13 * claims 10,18 *; | [XP]WO2017145415 (MORINAGA MILK INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1-13 * paragraphs [0029] - [0034] - [0039] , [0085]; claim 7 *; | [Y] - KUITUNEN M ET AL, "Probiotics prevent IgE-associated allergy until age 5 years in cesarean-delivered children but not in the total cohort", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 123, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JACI.2008.11.019, ISSN 0091-6749, (20090201), pages 335 - 341, (20090108), XP025907147 [Y] 1-13 * page 335 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2008.11.019 | [Y] - ZATOLLAH ASEMI ET AL, "Effect of Multispecies Probiotic Supplements on Metabolic Profiles, hs-CRP, and Oxidative Stress in Patients with Type 2 Diabetes", ANNALS OF NUTRITION AND METABOLISM: EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, METABOLIC DISEASES AND DIETETICS, Switzerland, (20130101), vol. 63, no. 1-2, doi:10.1159/000349922, ISSN 0250-6807, pages 1 - 9, XP055433345 [Y] 1-13 * page 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000349922 | [Y] - FATEMEH MOFIDI ET AL, "Abstract", BRITISH JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, UK, (20170314), vol. 117, no. 05, doi:10.1017/S0007114517000204, ISSN 0007-1145, pages 662 - 668, XP055432710 [Y] 1-13 * page 663 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/S0007114517000204 | [Y] - P. D. CANI ET AL, "Selective increases of bifidobacteria in gut microflora improve high-fat-diet-induced diabetes in mice through a mechanism associated with endotoxaemia", DIABETOLOGIA, (20070906), vol. 50, no. 11, doi:10.1007/s00125-007-0791-0, ISSN 0012-186X, pages 2374 - 2383, XP055179453 [Y] 1-13 * page 2375 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00125-007-0791-0 | [Y] - SHIZUKI KONDO ET AL, "Antiobesity effects of bifidobacterium breve strain B-3 supplementation in a mouse model with high-fat diet-induced obesity", BIOSCIENCE BIOTECHNOLOGY BIOCHEMIS, JAPAN SOCIETY FOR BIOSCIENCE, BIOTECHNOLOGY, AND AGROCHEMISTRY, TOKYO, JAPAN, vol. 74, no. 8, doi:10.1271/BBB.100267, ISSN 0916-8451, (20100823), pages 1656 - 1661, (20100807), XP008161355 [Y] 1-13 * page 1657 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/bbb.100267 | [Y] - TANNAZ ESLAMPARAST ET AL, "Effects of synbiotic supplementation on insulin resistance in subjects with the metabolic syndrome: a randomised, double-blind, placebo-controlled pilot study", BRITISH JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, UK, (20140801), vol. 112, no. 03, doi:10.1017/S0007114514000919, ISSN 0007-1145, pages 438 - 445, XP055432712 [Y] 1-13 * page 439 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/S0007114514000919 | [Y] - MICHELE MALAGUARNERA ET AL, "with Fructo-Oligosaccharides in Patients with Non Alcoholic Steatohepatitis", DIGESTIVE DISEASES AND SCIENCES, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NE, (20110908), vol. 57, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S10620-011-1887-4, ISSN 1573-2568, pages 545 - 553, XP035005634 [Y] 1-13 * page 546 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10620-011-1887-4 | [Y] - CAMILA MOROTI ET AL, "Effect of the consumption of a new symbiotic shake on glycemia and cholesterol levels in elderly people with type 2 diabetes mellitus", LIPIDS IN HEALTH AND DISEASE, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20120222), vol. 11, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1476-511X-11-29, ISSN 1476-511X, page 29, XP021118593 [Y] 1-13 * page 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1476-511X-11-29 | [Y] - HAKIKI MELANIE ET AL, "Fermented inulin hydrolysate by Bifidobacterium breve as cholesterol binder in functional food application", AIP CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, NEW YORK, US, (20170101), vol. 1803, doi:10.1063/1.4973161, ISSN 0094-243X, pages 020034 - 1, XP055458805 [Y] 1-13 * pages 020034-2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.4973161 | [Y] - OOI LAY-GAIK ET AL, "Cholesterol-lowering effects of probiotics and prebiotics: a review of in vivo and in vitro findings", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR SCIENCES, MOLECULAR DIVERSITY PRESERVATION INTERNATIONAL, BASEL, CH, (20100617), vol. 11, no. 6, doi:10.3390/IJMS11062499, ISSN 1422-0067, pages 2499 - 2522, XP002665634 [Y] 1-13 * page 2513 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/IJMS11062499 | [Y] - J.P. GRILL ET AL, "Effects of Lactobacillus amylovorus and Bifidobacterium breve on cholesterol", LETTERS IN APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, GB, (20000801), vol. 31, no. 2, doi:10.1046/j.1365-2672.2000.00792.x, ISSN 0266-8254, pages 154 - 156, XP055458967 [Y] 1-13 * page 155 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2672.2000.00792.x | [XP] - MONA MISCHKE ET AL, "Specific synbiotics in early life protect against diet-induced obesity in adult mice", DIABETES, OBESITY AND METABOLISM, (20180220), vol. 20, no. 6, doi:10.1111/dom.13240, ISSN 1462-8902, pages 1408 - 1418, XP055504709 [XP] 1-13 * page 1408 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/dom.13240 | by applicant | WO2004093899 | WO2006091103 | US7410653 | WO2011096808 | WO2013036102 | US9386793 | - STACKEBRANDT; GOEBEL, Int. J. Syst. Bacteriol., (19940000), vol. 44, pages 846 - 849 | - L. PROSKY et al., J. Assoc. Off. Anal. Chem., (19880000), vol. 71, pages 1017 - 1023 | - SWINBURN et al., Prev Med, (19990000), vol. 29, pages 563 - 570 |