EP3631798 - VOICE DRIVEN DYNAMIC MENUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/15] | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR VOICE DRIVEN DYNAMIC MENUS | ||
[2022/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Snap Inc. 3000 31st Street Santa Monica, California 90405 / US | [2021/25] |
Former [2020/15] | For all designated states Snap Inc. 2772 Donald Douglas Loop North Santa Monica, CA 90405 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAND, Jesse Santa Monica, California 90405 / US | [2022/26] |
Former [2020/15] | 01 /
CHAND, Jesse 2772 Donald Douglas Loop North Santa Monica, California 90405 / US | Representative(s) | Kramer, Dani, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/26] | Creation IP Ltd Hillington Park Innovation Centre 1 Ainslie Road Glasgow G52 4RU / GB | ||
Former [2020/15] | Schwegman Lundberg Woessner Limited Hillington Park Innovation Centre 1 Ainslie Road Glasgow G52 4RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18735008.7 | 30.05.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018US35083 | Priority number, date | US201762513269P | 31.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762513269 P | US201715805984 | 07.11.2017 Original published format: US201715805984 | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018222686 | Date: | 06.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3631798 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3631798 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/34, G11B27/031, G06F3/0482, G10L25/78, G10L21/003, G10L21/02 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
G06F3/0482 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/04817 (KR,US);
G06F3/165 (KR,US);
G06F3/167 (KR,US);
G10L21/003 (KR,US);
G10L21/02 (EP,KR,US);
G10L25/78 (EP,KR,US);
G11B27/031 (EP,KR,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPRACHGESTEUERTE DYNAMISCHE MENÜS | [2022/10] | English: | VOICE DRIVEN DYNAMIC MENUS | [2022/10] | French: | MENUS DYNAMIQUES COMMANDÉS PAR LA VOIX | [2022/10] |
Former [2020/15] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME FÜR SPRACHGESTEUERTE DYNAMISCHE MENÜS | ||
Former [2020/15] | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR VOICE DRIVEN DYNAMIC MENUS | ||
Former [2020/15] | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES POUR MENUS DYNAMIQUES COMMANDÉS PAR LA VOIX | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 12.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22174435.2 / EP4068287 | EP23194700.3 / EP4266309 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 29.06.2022 | AT | 29.06.2022 | CZ | 29.06.2022 | DK | 29.06.2022 | EE | 29.06.2022 | ES | 29.06.2022 | FI | 29.06.2022 | HR | 29.06.2022 | IT | 29.06.2022 | LT | 29.06.2022 | LV | 29.06.2022 | MC | 29.06.2022 | PL | 29.06.2022 | RO | 29.06.2022 | RS | 29.06.2022 | SE | 29.06.2022 | SI | 29.06.2022 | SK | 29.06.2022 | SM | 29.06.2022 | BG | 29.09.2022 | NO | 29.09.2022 | GR | 30.09.2022 | IS | 29.10.2022 | PT | 31.10.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1970824 (MAGIX AG [DE]) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0065] , [0066]; figure 10 *; | [IA]US2014229831 (CHORDIA PARAG P [US], et al) [I] 1-3,5-10,12-17,19 * abstract * [A] 4,11,18; | [I]US9256396 (MONSON MATTHEW J [US], et al) [I] 1,8,14* abstract *; | [XA]US2017111702 (JORDAN ADAM [US], et al) [X] 1,8,15 * paragraphs [0034] - [0038] - [0102] - [0114] * * figures 1,2,4,5 * [A] 2-7,9-14,16-19 |