EP3566915 - LOCKING AND UNLOCKING FIXTURE CAPABLE OF ADAPTIVE POSITION ADJUSTMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nio Co., Ltd. 20 Building No. 56 Antuo Road Anting Town Jiading Shanghai 201804 / CN | [2019/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENGTSSON, Jan 20 Building No.56 Antuo Road Anting Town Jiading Shanghai 201804 / CN | 02 /
LI, Nan 20 Building No.56 Antuo Road Anting Town Jiading Shanghai 201804 / CN | 03 /
DING, Xikun 20 Building No.56 Antuo Road Anting Town Jiading Shanghai 201804 / CN | 04 /
TIAN, Xiaotao 20 Building No.56 Antuo Road Anting Town Jiading Shanghai 201804 / CN | [2019/46] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/46] | Application number, filing date | 18736749.5 | 04.01.2018 | [2019/46] | WO2018CN71396 | Priority number, date | CN20172006535U | 04.01.2017 Original published format: CN 201720006535 U | [2019/46] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018127098 | Date: | 12.07.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3566915 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3566915 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60S5/06, B60K1/04 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
B60K1/04 (EP,US);
B60L53/80 (EP,US);
B60K2001/0455 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/46] | B60S5/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜR ADAPTIVE POSITIONSEINSTELLUNG FÄHIGE VERRIEGELUNGS- UND ENTRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/46] | English: | LOCKING AND UNLOCKING FIXTURE CAPABLE OF ADAPTIVE POSITION ADJUSTMENT | [2019/46] | French: | ACCESSOIRE DE BLOCAGE ET DE DÉBLOCAGE CAPABLE D'UN RÉGLAGE ADAPTATIF DE POSITION | [2019/46] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2019 | Translation filed | 31.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/46] | 23.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 03.08.2022 | AT | 03.08.2022 | CZ | 03.08.2022 | DK | 03.08.2022 | EE | 03.08.2022 | ES | 03.08.2022 | FI | 03.08.2022 | HR | 03.08.2022 | LT | 03.08.2022 | LV | 03.08.2022 | NL | 03.08.2022 | PL | 03.08.2022 | RO | 03.08.2022 | RS | 03.08.2022 | SE | 03.08.2022 | SI | 03.08.2022 | SK | 03.08.2022 | SM | 03.08.2022 | NO | 03.11.2022 | GR | 04.11.2022 | IS | 03.12.2022 | PT | 05.12.2022 | IE | 04.01.2023 | LU | 04.01.2023 | BE | 31.01.2023 | CH | 31.01.2023 | LI | 31.01.2023 | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/49] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
LU | 04.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
LU | 04.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
LU | 04.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 03.08.2022 | |
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]CN202743032U (WANG JUN) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0032] * [A] 8-10 [I] 6,7; | [XAI]CN203543623U (SHENZHEN JINGZHI MACHINE CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0044] * [A] 8-10 [I] 6,7; | [E]EP3552855 (NIO NEXTEV LTD [HK]) [E] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035] ** paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0055] * | International search | [A]JP2010188472 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-10 * , entire document *; | [A]JP2010203574 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-10* , entire document *; | [XA]CN102815190 (WANG JUN) [X] 1-5 * , description, paragraphs [0021]-[0032], and figures 1-5, description, paragraphs [0021]-[0032], and figures 1-5 * [A] 6-10; | [A]CN104724080 (STATE GRID CORP CHINA, et al) [A] 1-10 * , entire document *; | [A]CN205601588U (SHANGHAI DIANBA NEW ENERGY RESOURCES SCI & TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , entire document *; | [A]CN106080159 (NEXTEV LTD) [A] 1-10 * , entire document *; | [PX]CN206351680U (SHANGHAI NEXTEV CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs [0028]-[0040], and figures 1-6 * |