EP3539146 - MODULAR BROADBAND LIGHT SOURCE WITH LAMP INSERT AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Newport Corporation 1791 Deere Avenue Irvine, CA 92606 / US | [2019/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, John 16 Viejo Irvine California 92612 / US | 02 /
BUCZALA, Robert 26633 Frontage Road Bozeman Montana 59718 / US | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/38] | Walker, Ross Thomson Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18738744.4 | 15.01.2018 | [2019/38] | WO2018US13741 | Priority number, date | US201762446731P | 16.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762446731 P | US201762564995P | 28.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762564995 P | [2019/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018132800 | Date: | 19.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3539146 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/30 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
F21S8/006 (EP,US);
H01J61/30 (KR);
F21V15/01 (EP,US);
F21V23/0457 (EP,US);
H01J61/16 (KR);
H01J61/52 (KR);
H05B47/105 (EP,US);
H05B47/19 (EP,US);
F21Y2113/13 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/38] | Title | German: | MODULARE BREITBANDIGE LICHTQUELLE MIT LAMPENEINSATZ UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2019/38] | English: | MODULAR BROADBAND LIGHT SOURCE WITH LAMP INSERT AND METHODS OF USE | [2019/38] | French: | SOURCE LUMINEUSE À LARGE BANDE MODULAIRE DOTÉE D'UN INSERT DE LAMPE ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2019/38] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/38] | 20.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2001005172 (MIYASHITA KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,11,12 * figures 1a,1b,11,15 * * paragraphs [0022] , [0 69] , [0 74] , [ 105] , [ 114] * [Y] 6 [I] 3,4,7,9,10; | [YA]DE102006054332 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]) [Y] 6 * paragraphs [0031] , [0032] * [A] 1; | [A]WO2010060832 (OSRAM GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-12* page 2, line 8 - line 18 * | International search | [Y]US2002047546 (KAYSER ROY [CA]) [Y] 1-30 * See paragraphs [0036]-[0057]; claims 1-6, 12; and figures 2A-3. *; | [A]US2002167255 (ROBERTS ROY D [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * See paragraphs [0017]-[0032]; and figures 1-3. *; | [A]US2003137248 (BELL DEAN A [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * See paragraphs [0021]-[0028]; and figures 1-3. *; | [A]US2010283369 (CHEN CHIN-YI [TW]) [A] 1-30* See paragraphs [0027]-[0034]; and figures 3-7. *; | [Y]KR20150103078 (HOYA CANDEO OPTRONICS CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-30 * See paragraphs [0002]-[0003], [0025]-[0051]; and figures 1-6. * | by applicant | US2001005172 | US2002047546 | DE102006054332 | WO2010060832 | KR20150103078 |