EP3576902 - NANOPARTICLE COMPOSITE WELDING FILLER MATERIALS, AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HRL Laboratories, LLC 3011 Malibu Canyon Road Malibu, CA 90265-4799 / US | [2019/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAHATA, Brennan 1724 Colby Avenue Apt. 9 Los Angeles, California 90025 / US | 02 /
MAYER, Justin 313 Lake Mere Drive Southbury, Connecticut 06488 / US | 03 /
MARTIN, John 638 Tiber River Way Oxnard, California 93036 / US | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Coles, Andrea Birgit, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2019/50] | Application number, filing date | 18748214.6 | 26.01.2018 | [2019/50] | WO2018US15338 | Priority number, date | US201815880452 | 25.01.2018 Original published format: US201815880452 | US201762452988P | 01.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762452988 P | [2019/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018144322 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3576902 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B23K35/28, B23K35/02, B22F1/02, B23K35/30, B23K35/32, B23K35/36 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
B23K35/286 (EP,US);
B22F1/16 (EP,US);
B22F1/17 (EP,US);
B23K35/0227 (EP,US);
B23K35/0233 (EP,US);
B23K35/0244 (EP,US);
B23K35/284 (EP,US);
B23K35/302 (EP,US);
B23K35/3033 (EP,US);
B23K35/3053 (EP,US);
B23K35/325 (EP,US);
B23K35/3601 (EP,US);
B23K35/3602 (EP,US);
B23K35/3606 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F1/16, B22F1/17, B22F1/054 (US);
B22F2998/10, B22F1/16, B22F1/17, B22F1/054, B22F1/056 (US,EP);
B22F2998/10, B22F1/16, B22F1/17, B22F1/10, B22F3/02, B22F3/10 (US);
B22F2998/10, B22F1/16, B22F1/17, B22F1/10, B22F3/105 (US);
B22F2998/10, B22F1/16, B22F1/17, B22F1/10, B22F3/20 (US,EP);
B22F2998/10, B22F1/16, B22F1/17, B22F1/10, B22F3/225 (US);
B22F2999/00, B22F1/145, B22F1/17, B22F1/14, B22F1/16 (US,EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F1/16, B22F1/17, B22F1/14, B22F1/145 (EP,US) (-) |
Former IPC [2019/50] | B23K35/28, B23K35/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Title | German: | NANOPARTIKELVERBUNDSCHWEISSZUSATZWERKSTOFFE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/50] | English: | NANOPARTICLE COMPOSITE WELDING FILLER MATERIALS, AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2019/50] | French: | MATÉRIAUX DE REMPLISSAGE DE SOUDAGE COMPOSITE DE NANOPARTICULES ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION | [2019/50] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 01.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20080105250 (IND ACADEMIC COOP [KR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010091790 (BAYER INTERNAT SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]JP2011054892 (NIHON SUPERIOR CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015] *; | [X]US2014197147 (LI XIAOCHUN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0015] * | International search | [A]US2006196579 (SKIPOR ANDREW F [US], et al) [A] 1-25* See paragraph [0014], claims 1, 3 and figure 3. *; | [Y]KR20080105250 (IND ACADEMIC COOP [KR]) [Y] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0025] - [0028], [0045] - [0048], claims 1, 2 and figures 2, 3. *; | [Y]JP2011054892 (NIHON SUPERIOR CO LTD) [Y] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0008], [0013] - [0015], claim 1 and figures 1, 2. *; | [A]US2011127314 (HEINRICH ALEXANDER [DE], et al) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0025] - [0032] and figures 1-7. *; | [A]US2013020377 (STANKOWSKI ALEXANDER [CH], et al) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0045] - [0050], claim 1 and figures 3, 4. * |