EP3811652 - REDUCED RADIO LINK FAILURE FOR AERIAL UE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2024/32] |
Former [2021/17] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYDÉN, Henrik Östervägen 16A 169 52 Solna / SE | 02 /
ZOU, Zhenhua Nybodagatan 16, lgh 1114 171 42 Solna / SE | 03 /
LIN, Xingqin 2755 Augustine Drive Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | 04 /
MÄÄTTANEN, Helka-Liina Vallilantie 25 b 2 00510 Helsinki / FI | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2024/32] |
Former [2021/17] | Valea AB Box 7086 103 87 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 18750265.3 | 22.06.2018 | [2021/17] | WO2018IB54635 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019243879 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3811652 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3811652 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/02, H04W16/18 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
G08C17/00 (EP);
H04W60/04 (US);
H04W24/10 (EP);
H04W72/51 (EP);
H04W76/19 (EP,US);
H04W24/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERRINGERTER FUNKVERBINDUNGSAUSFALL FÜR BENUTZERGERÄT IN DER LUFT | [2021/17] | English: | REDUCED RADIO LINK FAILURE FOR AERIAL UE | [2021/17] | French: | DÉFAILLANCE DE LIAISON RADIO RÉDUITE POUR UE AÉRIEN | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 12.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.10.2022 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 12.10.2022 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 21.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016300492 (PASKO DOUGLAS M [US], et al); | [X]US9537561 (KOTECHA LALIT R [US], et al); | [X]WO2018019394 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]); |