EP3582935 - ROBOTIC GRIPPER CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teledyne FLIR Detection, Inc. 1024 South Innovation Way Stillwater, OK 74074 / US | [2022/35] |
Former [2019/52] | For all designated states FLIR Detection, Inc. 1024 South Innovation Way Stillwater Oklahoma / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOZEIKA, Annan, Michael 532 Chicopee Row Croton, MA 01450 / US | 02 /
OHM, Timothy, R. 110 Carmelde Lane Grover Beach, CA 93433 / GB | 03 /
BROWN, Christopher, Thomas 18 Aegean Lane Lowell, MA 01854 / US | [2019/52] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/52] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18753613.1 | 20.02.2018 | [2019/52] | WO2018US18734 | Priority number, date | US201762461089P | 20.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762461089 P | [2019/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018152504 | Date: | 23.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3582935 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B25J11/00, B25J5/00, B25J19/02, B25J9/04, B25J9/10, B25J15/02, B25J13/00, B25J9/16 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
B25J5/005 (EP,US);
B25J9/1697 (US);
B25J13/006 (US);
B25J13/065 (US);
B25J15/0009 (US);
B25J15/0213 (EP,US);
B25J19/023 (EP,US);
B25J9/161 (US);
B25J9/1612 (EP,US);
B25J9/162 (EP,US);
B25J9/1689 (EP,US);
Y10S901/01 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/52] | B25J11/00, B25J5/00, B25J19/02, B25J9/04, B25J9/10, B25J15/02, B25J13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] | Title | German: | ROBOTERGREIFERKAMERA | [2019/52] | English: | ROBOTIC GRIPPER CAMERA | [2019/52] | French: | CAMÉRA À PRÉHENSION ROBOTIQUE | [2019/52] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 18.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0413530 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1* figure 2 *; | [Y]US2008073922 (HOLTZ TODD GRANGER [US]) [Y] 3,4 * abstract *; | [XAY]JP2011156613 (B L AUTO TEC KK) [X] 1,2,5-9,11-13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraphs [0082] , [0083] * * paragraphs [0088] , [0089] * [A] 10,14 [Y] 3,4 | International search | [Y]KR19990052635 (KOREA ELECTRIC POWER CORPORATION et al.) [Y] 1-20 * See page 2, lines 16-45; and figures 1, 3-4. *; | [A]US6113343 (GOLDENBERG ANDREW [CA], et al) [A] 1-20* See column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 11; and figure 1. *; | [A]US2010164243 (ALBIN SCOTT R [US]) [A] 1-20; | [A]US2012286533 (METTLER MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0020]-[0026]; and figures 1-2. *; | [Y]US2016243698 (HOFFMAN ORIN P F [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0056]-[0148]; claim 50; and figures 1, 2A-2B, 3A, 4A, 7A, 8A, 10-11. * | by applicant | US2008073992 | JP2011156613 |