EP3593917 - WIRE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujikura Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Koto-Ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA Yuki c/o Fujikura Ltd. Sakura Works 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | 02 /
KAMIDAKI Chihiro c/o Fujikura Ltd. Sakura Works 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | 03 /
NOMURA Ryujiro c/o Fujikura Ltd. Sakura Works 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2020/03] | Application number, filing date | 18764470.3 | 06.03.2018 | [2020/03] | WO2018JP08617 | Priority number, date | JP20170046682 | 10.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017046682 | [2020/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018164134 | Date: | 13.09.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3593917 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B21C1/00, H01B7/00, H01B7/30, H01B13/00, H01F5/00 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
H01B7/30 (EP,KR);
H01B13/222 (KR);
H01B13/0036 (US);
B21C1/00 (US);
B21C1/003 (EP);
B21C1/02 (KR);
B21C37/042 (EP);
B21C37/045 (EP);
H01B13/08 (US);
H01B5/02 (EP);
H01F27/324 (KR);
H01F27/34 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] | Title | German: | DRAHT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2020/03] | English: | WIRE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2020/03] | French: | FIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DUDIT FIL | [2020/03] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2019 | Translation filed | 04.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/03] | 07.08.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2006127853 (FUJIKURA LTD) [A] 5-8* , *; | [A]JP2008229703 (VISCAS CORP, et al) [A] 1-8 * . *; | [A]WO2013046399 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * , *; | [A]JP2016108617 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD:THE) [A] 5-8 * , *; | [A]JP2016189459 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-8 | by applicant | JP2003077719 | JP2017046682 |