blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3602359

EP3602359 - COPY NUMBER VARIANT CALLER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.10.2023
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Myriad Women's Health, Inc.
180 Kimball Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
[2020/06]
Inventor(s)01 / HAAS, Kevin R.
c/o Counsyl Inc.
180 Kimball Way
South San Francisco California 94080 / US
02 / WANG, Xin
c/o Counsyl Inc.
180 Kimball Way
South San Francisco California 94080 / US
03 / GRAUMAN, Peter V.
c/o Counsyl Inc.
180 Kimball Way
South San Francisco California 94080 / US
 [2020/06]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2020/06]Hutter, Anton
Venner Shipley LLP
5 Stirling House
Stirling Road The Surrey Research Park
Guildford GU2 7RF / GB
Application number, filing date18772307.723.03.2018
[2020/06]
WO2018US24062
Priority number, dateUS201762476361P24.03.2017         Original published format: US 201762476361 P
[2020/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018175907
Date:27.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3602359
Date:05.02.2020
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2020/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.09.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.2020
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/10, C12Q1/68, G16B20/10, G16B40/00, G16H50/20, G06K9/00, G06K9/62
[2021/01]
CPC:
G16B40/00 (EP,US); G06F18/2415 (EP,US); G06F18/295 (EP,US);
G16B20/10 (EP,US); G16B30/00 (US); G16B30/10 (EP,US);
G16B40/30 (EP,US); G16B50/00 (EP,US); G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G06F2218/08 (EP,US); G06F2218/16 (EP,US); G06V2201/04 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2020/06]G06F19/22, G06F19/24, C40B30/02, C12N15/10, C12Q1/68
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/06]
TitleGerman:KOPIENZAHLVARIANTENCALLER[2020/06]
English:COPY NUMBER VARIANT CALLER[2020/06]
French:APPELANT DE VARIANTE DE NOMBRE DE COPIES[2020/06]
Entry into regional phase23.09.2019National basic fee paid 
23.09.2019Search fee paid 
23.09.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.09.2019Examination requested  [2020/06]
13.08.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.08.2021Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
09.10.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.02.2024Reply to a communication from the examining division
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
06.09.2021Request for further processing filed
06.09.2021Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.09.2021Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
09.03.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
16.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 07
25.03.2025Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]US2011257896  (DOWDS CARL A [US], et al) [I] 1 * paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0112] *;
 [I]US2014229117  (HALPERN AARON [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0097] * * paragraph [0141] - paragraph [0146] * * paragraph [0158] - paragraph [0160] * * paragraph [0176] * * paragraph [0248] *;
 [I]WO2014138153  (LIFE TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [I] 1 * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0098] *;
 [I]  - MICHALIS K. TITSIAS ET AL, "Statistical Inference in Hidden Markov Models Using k -Segment Constraints", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN STATISTICAL ASSOCIATION, US, (20160102), vol. 111, no. 513, doi:10.1080/01621459.2014.998762, ISSN 0162-1459, pages 200 - 215, XP055697217 [I] 1 * page 200 - page 201 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/01621459.2014.998762
International search[Y]US8383338  (KITZMAN JACOB [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 35-40, 44-47 * . Especially col 2 In 44-47, claim 1 *;
 [Y]US2013316915  (HALPERN AARON [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 35-40, 44-47 * . Especially para [0002], [0007], [0010], [0012], [0015], [0016], [0021], [0022], [[0032], [00175], [0203], claims 1-2 *;
 [Y]US2013337447  (PORRECA GREGORY J [US], et al) [Y] 47* . Especially para [0441] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.