EP3682475 - PACKAGING METHOD AND JOINT TECHNOLOGY FOR AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Finar Module Sagl Via Balestra 15a 6900 Lugano / CH | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINARELLI, Daniele Gianluigi Via Serafino Balestra 15a 6900 Lugano / CH | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/30] | Iqbal, Md Mash-Hud Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18782323.2 | 17.09.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018EP75059 | Priority number, date | US201762558887P | 15.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762558887 P | [2020/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019053256 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3682475 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/373 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
H01L23/3735 (EP,US);
H01L23/3733 (EP,US);
H01L23/40 (EP,US);
H01L25/072 (EP,US);
H01L25/18 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERBINDUNGSTECHNOLOGIE FÜR EINE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2020/30] | English: | PACKAGING METHOD AND JOINT TECHNOLOGY FOR AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2020/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONDITIONNEMENT ET TECHNOLOGIE D'ASSEMBLAGE POUR UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 14.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US3295089 (MOORE THOMAS W) [X] 1-5,8,9,11,12,14-17,25-27,38-41,44,46,49,50 * column 1, lines 1-35 * * column 2, lines 39-63 * * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 68; figures 1-6 * * column 5, lines 11-19 * [A] 24 [I] 10,13; | [XI]US4290080 (HYSELL ROBERT E, et al) [X] 1-5,9,11,14-17,25,26,30,32-34,37-42,44,46,50,51 * column 1, lines 5-60 * * column 2, lines 39-59 * * column 3, lines 4-15 * * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 46; figures 1,2,3 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 16; figures 4,5 * * column 5, line 22 - column 7, line 3; figure 6 * [I] 10,13,31; | [XI]US4574299 (GLASCOCK II HOMER H [US], et al) [X] 1-8,11,14-17,25-27,29,38-41,44,46-49,51 * column 1, lines 7-68 * * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 40; figure 1 * * column 4, line 41 - column 6, line 40; figures 2, 3A, 3B * [I] 10,13,43; | [A]US6397450 (OZMAT BURHAN [US]) [A] 1,18-22,52-56 * column 1, line 9 - column 2, line 8 * * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 4; figure 1 * * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 34; figures 2a-2d ** column 4, lines 34-42; figure 4 * | by applicant | US3656946 | US5397245 | ES2078171 | US6397450 | US6631078 | US6703640 | US6903457 | US7683472 | US8368207 | US8432030 | US8513798 | US2014353818 | US9082878 | US9159701 | US9589922 | US9673117 | US9691674 | US9691732 | US9691692 | - "Thermal Applications of Open Cell Metal Foams", B. OZMAT et al., Materials and Manufacturing Processes, (20040000), vol. 19, pages 839 - 862 | - S.B. PARK; RAHUL JOSHI, "Comparison of thermo-mechanical behavior of lead-free copper and tin-lead column grid array packages", Microelectronics Reliability, (20080000), vol. 48, doi:doi:10.1016/j.microrel.2007.12.008, pages 763 - 772, XP022658739 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.microrel.2007.12.008 | - S.GRASSO; Y.SAKKA; G. MAIZZA, "Electric current activated/assisted sintering (ECAS): a review of patents 1906-2008", Schi. Technol. Adv. Mater., (20090000), vol. 10, no. 053001, page 24 | - "Thermal Applications of Open Cell Metal Foams", B.OZMAT et al., Mat. And Manu. Processes, (20040000), vol. 19, pages 839 - 862 | - J.EVANS; J.Y. EVANS, "Packaging Factors Affecting the Fatigue Life of Power Transistor Die Bonds", IEEE Trans. On Comp. Pack. Manufact. Tech. PART A, (19980900), vol. 21, no. 3, page 459, XP011011111 |