EP3583066 - COMPOSITE NANOPARTICLE COMPOSITIONS AND ASSEMBLIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wake Forest University 391 Technology Way, Suite 199 Winston-Salem, NC 27101 / US | [2024/39] |
Former [2019/52] | For all designated states Wake Forest University 391 Technology Way, Suite 199 Winston-Salem, NC 27101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARROLL, David, L. 5173 Laurel View Drive Winston-Salem NC 27104 / US | 02 /
DUN, Chaochao c/o 501 Deacon Blvd Winston-Salem NC 27105 / US | 03 /
HEWITT, Corey c/o 501 Deacon Blvd Winston-Salem NC 27105 / US | 04 /
SUMMERS, Robert 577 Drumheller Road Clemmons NC 27012 / US | [2019/52] | Representative(s) | Invent Horizon IP Nordenskiöldsgatan 11A 211 19 Malmö / SE | [2024/39] |
Former [2019/52] | Phillips & Leigh LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18784750.4 | 16.02.2018 | [2019/52] | WO2018US00041 | Priority number, date | US201762459978P | 16.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762459978 P | [2019/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018190919 | Date: | 18.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3583066 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3583066 | Date: | 25.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B82Y30/00, C01B19/00, H01L31/0352, H01L31/028, G01N27/22, H10N10/852, H10N10/857 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
C01B19/007 (EP,KR,US);
H10N10/85 (KR);
H10N10/857 (EP,US);
C09K11/881 (EP,KR);
H10N10/01 (KR,US);
H10N10/852 (EP,KR);
H10N10/853 (KR);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2002/85 (US);
C01P2002/88 (US);
C01P2004/03 (US);
C01P2004/04 (EP,US);
C01P2004/24 (EP,US);
C01P2004/80 (US);
C01P2006/32 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/04] | B82Y30/00, C01B19/00, H01L31/0352, H01L31/028, H01L35/16, G01N27/22, H01L35/26 | ||
Former IPC [2019/52] | B82Y30/00, C01B19/00, H01L31/0352, H01L31/028, H01L35/16, G01N27/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENGESETZTE NANOPARTIKELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND -ANORDNUNGEN | [2019/52] | English: | COMPOSITE NANOPARTICLE COMPOSITIONS AND ASSEMBLIES | [2019/52] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET ENSEMBLES NANOPARTICULAIRES COMPOSITES | [2019/52] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 06.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2007269991 (JANG EUN JOO [KR], et al); | [A]WO2010117875 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2007169810 (VAN DUREN JEROEN K J [US], et al); | [XY]US2007269991 (JANG EUN JOO [KR], et al); | [Y]US2011100409 (KIM HYUN-SIK [KR], et al); | [Y]WO2012087660 (INTEL CORP [US], et al); | [A]US2013234375 (REN ZHIFENG [US], et al); | [Y]US2015200345 (MORELLI DONALD T [US], et al); | [Y]US2015243837 (SHIM MOONSUB [US], et al); | [Y]WO2016156265 (NEXDOT [FR]); |