EP3613150 - SCALABLE MM-WAVE ARRAYS WITH LARGE APERTURES REALIZED BY MM-WAVE DIELECTRIC WAVEGUIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of the General Counsel Building 170, Third Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | [2020/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOLATSHA, Nemat 120 E Remington Dr. Apt 206 Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 02 /
ARBABIAN, Mohammad, Amin 420 Via Palou Allen-204 Stanford, CA 940305-4070 / US | 03 /
MAMANDIPOOR, Babak 347 Kiely Blvd Apt D201 San Jose, CA 95129 / US | [2020/09] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/09] | Application number, filing date | 18787214.8 | 20.04.2018 | [2020/09] | WO2018US28612 | Priority number, date | US201762487842P | 20.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762487842 P | [2020/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018195453 | Date: | 25.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3613150 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/0413, H01P3/16, H01P5/12, H04B1/00, H04B7/06 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
H04B7/0617 (EP,US);
H04B1/0067 (EP,US);
H01P3/16 (EP,US);
H01Q21/24 (EP,US);
H04B7/0413 (EP,US);
H04Q3/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/09] | H04B3/36, H04B3/52, H04W16/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Title | German: | SKALIERBARE MM-WELLEN-ARRAYS MIT GROSSEN APERTUREN, DIE DURCH MM-WELLEN-DIELEKTRISCHE WELLENLEITER REALISIERT WERDEN | [2020/09] | English: | SCALABLE MM-WAVE ARRAYS WITH LARGE APERTURES REALIZED BY MM-WAVE DIELECTRIC WAVEGUIDES | [2020/09] | French: | RÉSEAUX EXTENSIBLES À ONDES MILLIMÉTRIQUES AYANT DE GRANDES OUVERTURES RÉALISÉES PAR DES GUIDES D'ONDES DIÉLECTRIQUES À ONDES MILLIMÉTRIQUES | [2020/09] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 27.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/43] | 20.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015295307 (COOK BENJAMIN S [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0107]; claims 2-17 *; | [A]US2016240907 (HAROUN BAHER S [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0077] * * figures 2-13 *; | [IA]US2017018852 (ADRIAZOLA ALDO [US], et al) [I] 1-4,6-15 * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0167] - paragraph [0178] * * paragraph [0216] - paragraph [0219] * * paragraph [0227] - paragraph [0232] * * paragraph [0274] - paragraph [0281] * * paragraph [0298] - paragraph [0303] * * figures 1,2,15,18A,18F,18G,18H,19A,19N,19O * [A] 5 | International search | [A]US6208313 (FRANK PETER MICHAEL [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [Y]US6777684 (VOLKOV LEONID [RU], et al) [Y] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A]US2010054227 (HETTSTEDT HEINZ-DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* entire document *; | [Y]US2010111537 (CHENG NING [US], et al) [Y] 8, 9, 11 * entire document *; | [Y]US2014132450 (CHEN PING-YU [TW], et al) [Y] 1-15 * entire document *; | [Y] - Thomas A. MILLIGAN, "Modern Antenna Design", Wiley-Interscience, (20050000), pages 1 - 663, URL: http://www.radio-astronomy.org/library/Antenna-design.pdf, (20180615), XP055553332 [Y] 7, 12 * entire document pp1-99 * | by applicant | US2015295307 | US2016240907 | US2017018852 |