EP3612086 - AORTIC FLOW METER AND PUMP FOR PARTIAL-AORTIC OCCLUSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2023 | Change - applicant | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, Twelfth Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | For all designated states The Government of the United States as Represented by the Secretary of the Airforce AFMCLO/JAZ 2240 B Street Building 11 Wright-Patterson AFB, Ohio 45433-7109 / US | [2023/51] |
Former [2020/09] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California, A California Corporation 1111 Franklin Street, Twelfth floor Oakland, California 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Michael Austin 4150 V Street PSSB 2100 Sacramento California 95817 / US | 02 /
WILLIAMS, Timothy K. 4250 Birch Creek Trl winston-Salem, NC 27106 / US | 03 /
NEFF, Lucas Paul 152 Erie Ave. Decatur Georgia 30030 / US | [2020/22] |
Former [2020/09] | 01 /
JOHNSON, Michael Austin 4150 V Street PSSB 2100 Sacramento California 95817 / US | ||
02 /
WILLIAMS, Timothy K. 101 Bodin Cir. Travis AFB California 94535 / US | |||
03 /
NEFF, Lucas Paul 152 Erie Ave. Decatur Georgia 30030 / US | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/09] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18788177.6 | 20.04.2018 | [2020/09] | WO2018US28694 | Priority number, date | US201762488625P | 21.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762488625 P | [2020/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018195507 | Date: | 25.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3612086 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/026, A61B5/02, A61B5/021, A61B5/027, A61B5/0285, A61B5/00, A61M25/10, A61B5/0215 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
A61B5/6853 (EP);
A61B17/12036 (US);
A61B17/12109 (US);
A61B17/12136 (US);
A61B5/02141 (EP);
A61B5/02158 (EP);
A61B5/026 (EP);
A61B5/027 (EP);
A61B5/0285 (EP);
A61B5/4836 (EP);
A61M25/10182 (US);
A61B2017/00022 (US);
A61B2017/00119 (US);
A61B2017/00199 (US);
A61B2017/00221 (US);
A61B2505/05 (EP);
A61M2205/18 (US);
A61M2205/3334 (US);
A61M2205/50 (US);
A61M2205/502 (US);
A61M2205/52 (US);
A61M2210/127 (US);
A61M2230/04 (US);
A61M2230/30 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/09] | A61B5/026, A61B5/02, A61B5/021, A61B5/027 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Title | German: | AORTENDURCHFLUSSMESSER UND PUMPE ZUR TEILAORTAOKKLUSION | [2020/09] | English: | AORTIC FLOW METER AND PUMP FOR PARTIAL-AORTIC OCCLUSION | [2020/09] | French: | DÉBITMÈTRE AORTIQUE ET POMPE POUR OCCLUSION AORTIQUE PARTIELLE | [2020/09] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 29.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5152776 (PINCHUK LEONARD [US]) [A] 3 * column 3, line 23 - line 43 *; | [XI]WO2013096548 (VOLCANO CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-10 * page 15, lines 21-23 * * page 16, lines 7, 8, 17 * * page 19, lines 7, 12 * * page 20, lines 29-31, 34 * * page 21, lines 1, 9, 11, 17 * * page 23, lines 28, 31 * * page 24, lines 8, 9 * * page 26, lines 12, 13, 17 * * page 27, lines 8, 9, 15, 23 * * page 29, lines 17, 18 * * page 30, line 1 * * page 60, lines 12-14, 17, 18 * * page 61, lines 17-21 * * page 5; figures 5, 6a * [I] 3; | [A]US2015327836 (STONE JAMES R [US], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US6394977 (TAYLOR STEVEN R [US], et al) [Y] 4, 19 * entire document *; | [Y]US6620128 (SIMHAMBHATLA MURTHY V [US]) [Y] 3 * entire document *; | [Y]US7229403 (SCHOCK ROBERT B [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US8790297 (BROMANDER THOMAS [US], et al) [Y] 13, 14* entire document *; | [Y]US2015290372 (MULLER PAUL F [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * entire document * | by applicant | WO2013096548 |