EP3692204 - HYDRAULIC CONTROL DEVICE FOR LIQUID- CONDUCTING HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCES AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eltek S.p.A. Strada Valenza, 5A 15033 Casale Monferrato (AL) / IT | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAVINI, Paolo c/o ELTEK S.p.A. Strada Valenza 5A I-15033 Casale Monferrato (Alessandria) / IT | 02 /
CERRUTI, Daniele c/o ELTEK S.p.A. Strada Valenza 5A I-15033 Casale Monferrato (Alessandria) / IT | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emmanuele II, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/33] | Gallarotti, Franco Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 18792479.0 | 27.09.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018IB57483 | Priority number, date | IT20170112704 | 06.10.2017 Original published format: IT201700112704 | [2020/33] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019069187 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3692204 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/08, A47L15/42, G01M3/26 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
D06F39/081 (EP,KR,US);
A47L15/421 (EP,KR);
A47L15/4217 (US);
F16K17/36 (US);
G01M3/26 (EP,KR,US);
A47L15/4212 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHE STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITSFÜHRENDE HAUSHALTSGERÄTE UND -SYSTEME | [2020/33] | English: | HYDRAULIC CONTROL DEVICE FOR LIQUID- CONDUCTING HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCES AND SYSTEMS | [2020/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE HYDRAULIQUE POUR APPAREILS ET SYSTÈMES ÉLECTROMÉNAGERS À CIRCULATION DE LIQUIDE | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 13.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]EP1085119 (ELTEK SPA [IT]); | [A]EP1798326 (ELTEK SPA [IT]); | [AD]WO2012140592 (ELTEK SPA [IT], et al); | [Y]WO2017017463 (SENTEC LTD [GB]) |