EP3580969 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SIGNAL MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAN, Rui No.5 Lize East Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 02 /
LI, Shaohua No.5 Lize East Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 7086 103 87 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/51] | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 18794094.5 | 18.04.2018 | [2019/51] | WO2018CN83534 | Priority number, date | WO2017CN83102 | 04.05.2017 Original published format: PCT/CN2017/083102 | [2019/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018201893 | Date: | 08.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3580969 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W56/00, H04W48/16, H04W48/08, // H04W36/00, H04W72/04, H04W24/10, H04W24/02 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
H04W56/00 (EP);
H04W56/0015 (EP,US);
H04W36/0088 (EP,US);
H04W48/08 (EP);
H04W48/16 (EP);
H04W56/005 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/51] | H04W56/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SIGNALMESSUNG | [2019/51] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SIGNAL MEASUREMENT | [2019/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE SIGNAL | [2019/51] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 23.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/12] | 20.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2012178465 (LIN SHIANG-JIUN [TW], et al) [I] 1-5,7-12,14,15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0047] * * figures 1A-4 *; | [XI]US2013308481 (KAZMI MUHAMMAD [SE], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0129] - paragraph [0131] * * paragraph [0140] * * paragraph [0169] - paragraph [0174] * * paragraph [0191] - paragraph [0196] * * paragraph [0212] - paragraph [0221] * * paragraph [0224] - paragraph [0253] * * paragraph [0285] - paragraph [0292] * * figures 4,4a,7 * [I] 2-5,7-12,14,15; | [Y]US2016057708 (SIOMINA IANA [SE], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-12,14,15 * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0137] * * paragraph [0145] * * paragraph [0186] - paragraph [0201] * * paragraph [0209] - paragraph [0224] * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2016302098 (GHEORGHIU VALENTIN ALEXANDRU [JP], et al) [A] 1-5,7-12,14,15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0060] *; | [Y] - HUAWEI, "Email discussion [86b-20] on synchronization and carrier rasters for NR", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20161114 - 20161118, (20161114), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1611684 EMAIL DISCUSSIONS 86B-20 ON SYNCHRONIZATION AND CARRIER RASTERS FOR NR V5, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-0692, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20161114), XP051176990 [Y] 1-5,7-12,14,15 * paragraph [02.2] - paragraph [02.4] * * Appendix * | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Discussion on the RRM impact on flexible bandwidth", vol. RAN WG4, no. Athens, Greece; 20170213 - 20170217, (20170212), 3GPP DRAFT; R4-1701426, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN4/Docs/, (20170212), XP051214454 [A] 1-5,7-12,14,15 * paragraph [002.] * | [IP] - ERICSSON, "Configuration of measurement gap in NR", vol. RAN WG2, no. Prague, Czech Republic;, (20170928), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1711340 - MEASUREMENT GAP CONFIGURATION IN NR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_99bis/Docs/, (20170928), XP051354637 [IP] 1-5,7-12,14,15 * paragraphs [02.2] , [ 2.3] * | International search | [X]US2016302098 (GHEORGHIU VALENTIN ALEXANDRU [JP], et al) [X] 1, 7-14, 20-32 * claims 1-14, description, paragraphs [0005]-[0018], [0047]-[0108] and figure 13 *; | [A]US2017034757 (YANG MING [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2016146177 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE]) [A] 1-32 * the whole document * |