EP3707892 - OBTAINING IMAGE DATA OF AN OBJECT IN A SCENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SM | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke KPN N.V. Wilhelminakade 123 3072 AP Rotterdam / NL | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TER HAAR, Frank Dwergroosweide 1 3448 ZH Woerden / NL | 02 /
VAN DER STAP, Nanda Willem Kuijperstraat 38 2584 XW The Hague / NL | 03 /
STOKKING, Hans Maarten Jasmijnpad 4 2292 CH Wateringen / NL | 04 /
PRINS, Martin Thorbeckelaan 263 2564 BL The Hague / NL | 05 /
GUNKEL, Simon Clarissenhof 49 1115 CB Duivendrecht / NL | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | Wuyts, Koenraad Maria Koninklijke KPN N.V. Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 25110 3001 HC Rotterdam / NL | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 18796483.8 | 09.11.2018 | [2020/38] | WO2018EP80713 | Priority number, date | EP20170201151 | 10.11.2017 Original published format: EP 17201151 | [2020/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019092161 | Date: | 16.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3707892 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3707892 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/222, H04N25/40 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
H04N5/2226 (EP,US);
G06T7/20 (US);
G06T7/50 (US);
G06T7/70 (US);
G06V10/25 (US);
H04N23/61 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/38] | H04N5/222, H04N5/341 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERHALTEN VON BILDDATEN VON EINEM OBJEKT IN EINER SZENE | [2020/38] | English: | OBTAINING IMAGE DATA OF AN OBJECT IN A SCENE | [2020/38] | French: | OBTENTION DE DONNÉES D'IMAGE D'UN OBJET DANS UNE SCÈNE | [2020/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 10.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2014254919 (SUN XUN [CN], et al) [Y] 8,9* abstract *; | [Y]US2014307775 (OUEDRAOGO NAËL [FR], et al) [Y] 5,15 * abstract *; | [XYI]US2017124717 (BARUCH GILAD [IL], et al) [X] 1-4,7,10-14,16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 19] - [0023] - [0 27] , [0 33] - [0037] - [0 42] - [0046] - [0078] , [0 85]; figures 13, 14, 15; claim 24 * [Y] 5,8,9,15 [I] 6 | by applicant | US8702000 | - CAMPLANI, M.; SALGADO, L., "Background foreground segmentation with RGB-D Kinect data: An efficient combination of classifiers", Journal of Visual Communication and Image Representation, (20140000), vol. 25, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jvcir.2013.03.009, pages 122 - 136, XP028804219 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jvcir.2013.03.009 | - CASELLE, MICHELE et al., "Ultrafast streaming camera platform for scientific applications", IEEE Transactions on Nuclear Science, (20130000), vol. 60.5, doi:doi:10.1109/TNS.2013.2252528, pages 3669 - 3677, XP011529046 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TNS.2013.2252528 | - SCHREY, OLAF et al., "A 1 K/spl times/1 K high dynamic range CMOS image sensor with on-chip programmable region-of-interest readout", IEEE Journal of Solid-State Circuits, (20020000), vol. 37.7, pages 911 - 915 | - "Efficient Component Labeling of Images of Arbitrary Dimension Represented by Linear Bintrees", SAMET, H.; TAMMINEN, M., IEEE Transactions on Pattern Analysis and Machine Intelligence, IEEE., (19880000), vol. 10, page 579 |