EP3706761 - BIOCONVERSION OF OLEUROPEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CZ, RO | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORCAJADA, Marie, Noëlle 168 rue de la Pierre 01170 Echenevex / FR | 02 /
DUBOUX, Stéphane 90 Chemin de la Damaz 1162 St-Prex / CH | 03 /
POQUET, Laure Chemin aux Channey 17 1077 Servion / CH | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | Chautard, Cécile Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 18803591.9 | 08.11.2018 | [2020/38] | WO2018EP80547 | Priority number, date | EP20170200589 | 08.11.2017 Original published format: EP 17200589 | [2020/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019092068 | Date: | 16.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3706761 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3706761 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7048, A61K36/63, A23L33/135, C12Q1/6809, A61K35/741, C12Q1/689, A61K31/7042, A61P19/00 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
C12Q1/689 (EP);
A61K31/7048 (EP,US);
A23L2/52 (EP,US);
A23L33/135 (EP,US);
A61K35/745 (US);
A61K35/747 (US);
A61K36/63 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61K9/0095 (US);
A23V2002/00 (EP);
A23V2400/11 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/7048, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOKONVERSION VON OLEUROPEIN | [2020/38] | English: | BIOCONVERSION OF OLEUROPEIN | [2020/38] | French: | BIOCONVERSION D'OLEUROPÉINE | [2020/38] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 08.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.06.2023 | 14.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 15.11.2023 | DK | 15.11.2023 | EE | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/34] | DK | 15.11.2023 | |
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 15.11.2023 | |
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HR | 15.11.2023 | |
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HR | 15.11.2023 | |
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HR | 15.11.2023 | |
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2007118631 (INDENA SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 1-33 * the whole document ** Example 7 *; | [XYI]US2008014322 (IBARRA ALVIN [ES], et al) [X] 26,27 * the whole document * * para. 71-73 * [Y] 1-25,30-33 [I] 28,29; | [XYI]US9132145 (LEE-HUANG SYLVIA [US], et al) [X] 26 * the whole document * * col. 3, l. 50 - col. 4, l. 4; col. 10, ll. 1-25; col. 17, ll. 21-27 * [Y] 1-25,30-33 [I] 27-29; | [Y]US2016101125 (HORCAJADA MARIE NOELLE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-33 * the whole document * * para. 7, 73-74 *; | [Y]US2016263139 (HORCAJADA MARIE NOELLE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-33 * the whole document * * para. 7, 88 *; | [Y] - VARELA-EIRIN M ET AL, "Olive-derived oleuropein as a potential treatment for bone and cartilage age-related disorders", OSTEOARTHRITIS AND CARTILAGE, (2016), vol. 24, doi:10.1016/J.JOCA.2016.01.730, ISSN 1063-4584, XP029467430 [Y] 1-33 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.joca.2016.01.730 | [Y] - KOK-YONG CHIN ET AL, "Olives and Bone: A Green Osteoporosis Prevention Option", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ENVIRONMENTAL RESEARCH AND PUBLIC HEALTH, (20160726), vol. 13, no. 8, doi:10.3390/ijerph13080755, page 755, XP055539291 [Y] 1-33 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/ijerph13080755 | [Y] - SANTOS M M ET AL, "Bioconversion of oleuropein to hydroxytyrosol by lactic acid bacteria", WORLD JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20120320), vol. 28, no. 6, doi:10.1007/S11274-012-1036-Z, ISSN 1573-0972, pages 2435 - 2440, XP035053735 [Y] 1-33 * the whole document * * p. 2439, col. 2; Fig. 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11274-012-1036-z | by applicant | EP1839492 | US2009035437 | WO2015055468 | US2016045519 | US2016120891 | - C. SCHMITT et al., Soft Matter, (20100000), vol. 6, pages 4876 - 4884 |