EP3718267 - FAILOVER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British Telecommunications public limited company 1 Braham Street London E1 8EE / GB | [2022/07] |
Former [2020/41] | For all designated states British Telecommunications Public Limited Company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CURRY, Thomas Ground Floor Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | 02 /
HUBERT, Malcolm Ground Floor Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | British Telecommunications public limited company Intellectual Property Department 9th Floor One Braham Braham Street London E1 8EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/41] | British Telecommunications public limited company Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor, Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 18804019.0 | 23.11.2018 | [2020/41] | WO2018EP82348 | Priority number, date | EP20170204721 | 30.11.2017 Original published format: EP 17204721 | [2020/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019105856 | Date: | 06.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3718267 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/703, H04L12/707, H04W40/02 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
H04L45/28 (EP,US);
H04L45/02 (EP,US);
H04L45/22 (EP,US);
H04L45/74 (US);
H04W40/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Title | German: | AUSFALLSICHERUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/41] | English: | FAILOVER SYSTEM | [2020/41] | French: | SYSTÈME DE BASCULEMENT SUR PANNE | [2020/41] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 11.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.11.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 25.11.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.12.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002080752 (JOHANSSON FREDRIK [SE], et al) [X] 1,7-9,12-14 * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0165] *; | [A]US2006092955 (DURBIN MARK R [US], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0046]; figure 4 *; | [X]US2017279664 (ZHANG SHUANG [NL], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0019]; figures 3,6 * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0094] * |