EP3718085 - IMAGE RECONSTRUCTION METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kromek Limited NetPark Thomas Wright Way Sedgefield, Durham TS21 3FD / GB | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE VILLIERS, Angus Kromek Limited NetPark Thomas Wright Way Sedgefield Durham TS21 3FD / GB | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/41] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 18815796.0 | 29.11.2018 | [2020/41] | WO2018GB53453 | Priority number, date | GB20170019929 | 30.11.2017 Original published format: GB 201719929 | [2020/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019106367 | Date: | 06.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3718085 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/00 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
G06T11/006 (EP);
G01N23/10 (US);
G01N23/04 (US);
G01N23/083 (US);
G06T15/08 (US);
G01N2223/04 (US);
G01N2223/3306 (US);
G01N2223/3307 (US);
G01N2223/401 (US);
G06T2207/10081 (US);
G06T2207/30112 (US);
G06T2211/40 (US);
G06T2211/436 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Title | German: | BILDREKONSTRUKTIONSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM | [2020/41] | English: | IMAGE RECONSTRUCTION METHOD AND SYSTEM | [2020/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE RECONSTRUCTION D'IMAGES | [2020/41] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 28.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/25] | 05.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2008142446 (DURHAM SCIENT CRYSTALS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI]WO2010092368 (DURHAM SCIENT CRYSTALS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-9,11-15 * abstract * * figure 2 * [I] 10; | [XI]WO2011025494 (ANALOGIC CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0039] * [I] 10 |